Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028963

EP2028963 - TINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/10]TINTING BOWL
[2011/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sloan, Ashley
4.03 9-19 Myrtle Street
Botany, NSW 2019 / AU
[2012/15]
Former [2009/10]For all designated states
Sloan, Ashley
4.03 9-19 Myrtle Street
Botany, NSW 2019 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/10]
Representative(s)Johnson, Lucy Elizabeth
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]Johnson, Lucy Elizabeth
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2009/10]Henderson, Lucy Elizabeth
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date07718946.222.05.2007
[2009/10]
WO2007AU00700
Priority number, dateAU2006090274622.05.2006         Original published format: AU 2006902746
[2009/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134393
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028963
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028963
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A45D19/06
[2009/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/10]
TitleGerman:TÖNUNGSVERFAHREN[2011/45]
English:TINTING METHOD[2011/45]
French:METHODE DE TEINTURE[2011/45]
Former [2009/10]FÄRBESCHÜSSEL
Former [2009/10]TINTING BOWL
Former [2009/10]BOL POUR TEINTURE
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
19.12.2008Search fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/10]
26.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2012Fee for grant paid
28.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2011
Opposition(s)14.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.05.2007
AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
TR11.04.2012
IE22.05.2012
LU22.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
TR11.04.2012
IE22.05.2012
LU22.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2014/21]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
TR11.04.2012
IE22.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/34]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
MT11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
IE22.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG11.07.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
IE22.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/20]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
IE22.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/10]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
CZ11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
RO11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
SK11.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/09]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
EE11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
NL11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/03]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2012/51]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
SI11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
LV11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
IS11.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
PL11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
IS11.08.2012
Former [2012/48]FI11.04.2012
LT11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
Former [2012/47]LT11.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US3991719  (BRUCE DAVID) [X] 1,3,4 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 18 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 28 - column 3, line 37 * * column 4, line 4 - column 4, line 38 * * column 4, line 47 - line 58 * [A] 14,15 [I] 2,5-13;
 [XAI]US4182462  (BUFF GEORGE J JR [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 7 - line 14 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 46 * * column 4, line 31 - line 37 * [A] 14,15 [I] 2-13;
 [XAI]US5445110  (BIRNIE VIRITA L [US]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 13 * * column 4, line 28 - line 39 * * column 4, line 54 - line 57 * * column 5, line 3 - line 13 * [A] 14,15 [I] 4-13;
 [A]JP2002370951  (MERIIDOU BEAUTY PRODUCTS KK) [A] 14,15 * paragraph [0008] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0371622  (STEVENS HENRY GUY) [A] 5-13 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 20 *
International search[X]FR2459028  (BERRIO DE LA FE A [ES]);
 [A]US5709168  (WALKER ROBERT T [US]);
 [X]US2004003460  (ZOLOTNIK VLADIMIR [US]);
 [X]US2004237185  (ZOLOTNIK VLADIMIR [US]);
 [X]US3991719  (BRUCE DAVID)
by applicantJP2002370951