Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026888

EP2026888 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING GAMING ACTIVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2013  [2013/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRG Enterprizes Pty Limited
Level 5 45 Jones Street
Ultimo, NSW 2007 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
SRG Enterprizes Pty Limted
Level 5, 45 Jones Street
Ultimo, NSW 2007 / AU
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
G5 Enterprizes Pty Ltd
Level 5, 45 Jones Street
Ultimo NSW 2007 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / AMOUR, Marc
1601/1, Kings Cross Road
Rushcutters Bay, NSW 2011 / AU
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Leihkauf, Steffen Falk , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Leihkauf, Steffen Falk , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07719019.701.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007AU00774
Priority number, dateAU2006090303102.06.2006         Original published format: AU 2006903031
AU2006010087613.10.2006         Original published format: AU 2006100876
AU2006010087713.10.2006         Original published format: AU 2006100877
AU2006010087813.10.2006         Original published format: AU 2006100878
AU2006090660024.11.2006         Original published format: AU 2006906600
AU2006090659924.11.2006         Original published format: AU 2006906599
AU2007010014423.02.2007         Original published format: AU 2007100144
AU2007090094623.02.2007         Original published format: AU 2007900946
AU2007010041422.05.2007         Original published format: AU 2007100414
AU2007090272822.05.2007         Original published format: AU 2007902728
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007140515
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026888
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10, G07F17/32
[2011/51]
Former International [2009/09]A63F13/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesAL16.12.2008
BA16.12.2008
HR16.12.2008
MK16.12.2008
RS16.12.2008
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHAFFUNG VON SPEILAKTIVITÄTEN[2009/09]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING GAMING ACTIVITIES[2009/09]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PROPOSER DES ACTIVITÉS DE JEUX DE HASARD[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2008National basic fee paid 
16.12.2008Search fee paid 
16.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
16.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
23.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/01]
13.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201105   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2011
30.06.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005192087  (FRIEDMAN STACY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [I]EP1291046  (ARUZE CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [I]WO0043087  (JOHN HUXLEY LIMITED [GB]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[X]WO2006020692  (WALKER DIGITAL LLC [US], et al);
 [A]US6254482  (WALKER JAY S [US], et al);
 [A]US2001012797  (WALKER JAY S [US], et al);
 [A]US2005179206  (COGERT MITCHELL A [US]);
 [A]US2006046840  (WALKER JAY S [US], et al)