Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021403

EP2021403 - PROCESS OF CONFECTION OF POLYAMIDE COMPOUNDS WITH NATURAL FIBERS AND COMPOUNDS OF POLYAMIDES WITH NATURAL FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.04.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sabic Innovative Plastics South América - Indústria de Comércio de Plásticos Ltda.
Av. Ibirapuera, 2332 Torre Ibirapuera I-CJ. 42
04028-900 São Paulo SP / BR
For all designated states
UNIVERSIDADE ESTADUAL DE CAMPINAS - UNICAMP
Cidade Universitária Zeferino Vaz Distrito de Barao Geraldo
13084-971 Campinas - SP / BR
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / DE PAOLI, Marco, Aurélio
Instituto de Química da Unicamp
Campinas - SP 13083970 / BR
02 / GODOI FERMOSELLI, Karen Kely
Av. Benjamin Constant 1820 apto 152
Centro Campinas - SP / BR
03 / DA SILVA SPINACÉ, Márcia Aparecida
Av. Padre Domingos Giovanini 1005 Parque Alto
Taquaral Campinas - SP / BR
04 / DOS SANTOS, Paulo Aparecido
Rua José Geraldo de Abreu 22 Bairro Canjaranas
Vinhedo - SP 13280-000 / BR
05 / GIRIOLI, João Carlos
Rua Hermantino Coelho 901 apto 102 Mansões Santo Antônio
Campinas SP 13087-500 / BR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Brady, Paul Andrew , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[2014/04]
Former [2009/07]Senior, Janet , et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date07719290.424.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007BR00122
Priority number, dateBR2006PI0209725.05.2006         Original published format: BR PI0602097
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007137378
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021403
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/04, C08J5/06, C08L77/00, C08L77/02, C08K7/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONFEKTIONIERUNG VON POLYAMIDMASSEN MIT NATURFASERN UND MASSEN VON POLYAMIDEN MIT NATURFASERN[2009/07]
English:PROCESS OF CONFECTION OF POLYAMIDE COMPOUNDS WITH NATURAL FIBERS AND COMPOUNDS OF POLYAMIDES WITH NATURAL FIBERS[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSÉS DE POLYAMIDE AVEC DES FIBRES NATURELLES ET COMPOSÉS DE POLYAMIDE AVEC DES FIBRES NATURELLES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
09.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/21]
09.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2781492  (RAVACHOL ANDRE [FR]) [X] 9 *see page 1, line 26 to page 3, line 11; claims 1-9 and examples 1-2* [Y] 1-7;
 [XY]  - HERMAN WINATA ET AL, "Applications of Polyamide/Cellulose Fiber/Wollastonite Composites for Microcellular Injection Molding", ANTEC, (2003), pages 701 - 705, XP002471423 [X] 9 * see paragraph bridging pages 701-702, page 702, "Materials and Experiments" and page 703, "Conclusion" * [Y] 1-7
 [Y]  - ALEXANDRE GOMES ET AL, "Effects of Alkali Treatment to Reinforcement on Tensile Properties of Curaua Fiber Green Composites", JSME INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL, (2004), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 541 - 546, XP002471424 [Y] 1-7,9 * see page 541 and page 545, paragraphs 3.3 and 4 *
 [XY]  - JOHAN FELIX ET AL, "Plasma Modification of Cellulose Fibers: Effects on Some Polymer Composite Properties", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 51, pages 285 - 295, XP002471425 [X] 9 * see page 285; page 286, "Materials"; pages 293-295, "Conclusions" * [Y] 1-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1994.070510211
 [Y]  - THIRD INTERNATIONAL WOOD AND NATURAL FIBRE COMPOSITES SYMPOSIUM, KASSEL (GERMANY), (20000919), pages 2-1 - 2-14, XP002471426 [Y] 1-7,9 * see pages 2-8 to 2-10 *