Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027704

EP2027704 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING A SUB-DOMAIN WITHIN A BROADCAST DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.09.2015
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockstar Consortium US LP
2201 Lakeside Boulevard
Suite 1N-110
Richardson, TX 75082 / US
[2014/24]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SMALLEGANGE, Gerald
18 Lucas Lane
Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1S5 / CA
02 / MOHAN, Dinesh
89 Kenins Cres.
Kanata, Ontario K2K 3E5 / CA
03 / HOLNESS, Marc
928 Fisher Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 6P4 / CA
04 / CHARBONNEAU, Martin
1 rue de Carteret
Gatineau, Québec J9H 7N4 / CA
05 / ELLIS, Donald
598 Highland Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K2A 2K1 / CA
06 / BASHFORD, Adrian
186 Lanark Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 6R5 / CA
 [2009/18]
Former [2009/09]01 / SMALLEGANGE, Gerald
18 Lucas Lane
Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1S5 / CA
02 / MOHAN, Dinesh
89 Kenins Cres.
Kanata, Ontario K2K 3E5 / CA
03 / HOLNESS, Marc
928 Fisher Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 6P4 / CA
04 / CHARBONNEAU, Martin
173 De La Galene
Hull, Québec J8Z 2M5 / CA
05 / ELLIS, Donald
598 Highland Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K2A 2K1 / CA
06 / BASHFORD, Adrian
186 Lanark Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 6R5 / CA
Representative(s)Brophy, David Timothy , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Brophy, David Timothy , et al
FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2009/09]Boyce, Conor , et al
FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date07719814.118.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007CA00892
Priority number, dateUS20060802336P22.05.2006         Original published format: US 802336 P
US2006054617011.10.2006         Original published format: US 546170
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134445
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027704
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, H04L12/24
[2014/40]
Former International [2009/09]H04L29/14, H04L12/18, H04L9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ EINER SUBDOMÄNE IN EINER BROADCAST-DOMÄNE[2009/09]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING A SUB-DOMAIN WITHIN A BROADCAST DOMAIN[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE PROTÉGER UN SOUS-DOMAINE À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN DOMAINE DE DIFFUSION[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Search fee paid 
22.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
31.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/41]
15.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003067917  (MORRISON LYNNE CHRISTINE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2005111351  (SHEN NAIMING [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * figure 9 *;
 [A]US2004090913  (SCUDDER JOHN GALEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]WO2005039085  (CISCO TECH IND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 5 *
International search[X]US2003018927  (GADIR OMAR M A [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2007005347  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al);
 [A]US6105151  (MAHALINGAM MALLIKARJUNAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2003108052  (INOUE RUMIKO [JP], et al)