Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026829

EP2026829 - COMPOUND FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF VALVULAR STENOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/09]METHOD AND COMPOUND FOR THE TREATMENT OF VALVULAR STENOSIS
[2012/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut de Cardiologie de Montréal
5000 Rue Bélanger est
Montréal QC H1T 1C8 / CA
[2013/02]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Institut de Cardiologie de Montréal
5000 Rue Bélanger est
Montréal QC H1T 1C8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / TARDIF, Jean-Claude
3945 rue de la Princesse
Laval, Québec H7E 5K2 / CA
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Domenego, Bertrand
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2013/02]
Former [2012/34]Domenego, Bertrand
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2009/40]Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
D-80335 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Turner, Craig Robert
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date07719817.423.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007CA00895
Priority number, dateUS20060809850P01.06.2006         Original published format: US 809850 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137400
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026829
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026829
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61K31/661, A61K31/688, A61P9/10
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON IDIOPATHISCHER PULMONARER FIBROSE[2012/32]
English:COMPOUND FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF VALVULAR STENOSIS[2012/32]
French:COMPOSÉ POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES STÉNOSES VALVULAIRES[2012/32]
Former [2009/09]VERFAHREN UND VERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KLAPPENSTENOSE
Former [2009/09]METHOD AND COMPOUND FOR THE TREATMENT OF VALVULAR STENOSIS
Former [2009/09]MÉTHODE ET COMPOSÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES STÉNOSES VALVULAIRES
Entry into regional phase05.12.2008National basic fee paid 
05.12.2008Search fee paid 
05.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
10.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2012Fee for grant paid
29.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12167547.4  / EP2537526
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2010
Opposition(s)10.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.05.2007
AT09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2015/13]AT09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
Former [2013/26]SI09.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005080013  (DASSEUX JEAN-LOUIS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0013] , [0045] - [0048] - [0082] , [0085] , [0091] , [0297] , [0325] , [0331] - [0333] - [0342] - [0347] * * sequence 4 *;
 [Y]WO9916409  (DASSEUX JEAN LOUIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, lines 9,10 * * page 10 - page 12 * * page 13, line 15 - line 17 * * page 18, lines 24,25 * * page 19, line 20 - line 24 * * page 29, line 3 - line 8 * * sequence 4 *
 [Y]  KAUL S ET AL, "INTRAMURAL DELIVERY OF RECOMBINANT APOLIPOPROTEIN A-IMILANO/PHOSPHOLIPID COMPLEX (ETC-216) INHIBITS IN-STENT STENOSIS IN PORCINE CORONARY ARTERIES", CIRCULATION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20030101), vol. 107, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2551 - 2554, XP008052856 [Y] 1-15 * page 2551, columns 1,2 * * page 2552, column 8 * * page 2553, columns 1,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000074042.19447.B1
International search[Y]WO9916459  (DASSEUX JEAN LOUIS [US], et al);
 [Y]  - ROSSEBO A.B. ET AL., "Hyperlipidemia and aortic valve disease", CURRENT OPINION IN LIPIDOLOGY, (2004), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 447 - 451, XP008091348

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.mol.0000137229.00020.fe