EP2021368 - DERIVATIZED INSULIN OLIGOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diabecore Medical Inc. 120 Eglington Ave E. Toronto ON M4P 1E2 / CA | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOUGHEED, William D. 28 Crestview Road Toronto, Ontario M5N 1H6 / CA | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07719936.2 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007CA01020 | Priority number, date | US20060811766P | 08.06.2006 Original published format: US 811766 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007140619 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021368 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/62, A61K38/28, A61P3/10, A61P5/50 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | DERIVATISIERTE INSULINOLIGOMERE | [2009/07] | English: | DERIVATIZED INSULIN OLIGOMERS | [2009/07] | French: | OLIGOMÈRES D'INSULINE DÉRIVÉS | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5053389 (BALSCHMIDT PER [DK], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]DE19535701 (DEUTSCHES WOLLFORSCHINST [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4705845 (CERAMI ANTHONY [US], et al); | [A]US5242900 (ALBISSER A MICHAEL [CA]); | [X]US5453417 (LOUGHEED WILLIAM D [CA]) |