Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021837

EP2021837 - OPTICALLY EFFECTIVE SURFACE RELIEF MICROSTRUCTURES AND METHOD OF MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROLIC Technologies AG
Gewerbestrasse 18
4123 Allschwill / CH
[2018/11]
Former [2017/44]For all designated states
Rolic AG
Grafenauweg 8
6300 Zug / CH
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Rolic AG
Chamerstrasse 50
6300 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / STALDER, Martin
Im Drissel 9
CH-4104 Oberwil / CH
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Veenstra, Eva
Rolic Technologies Ltd.
Patent Department
Gewerbestrasse 18
4123 Allschwil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Veenstra, Eva
Rolic Technologies Ltd. Patent Department Gewerbestrasse 18
4123 Allschwil / CH
Former [2009/07]Veenstra, Eva
Rolic Technologies Ltd. Patent Department Gewerbestrasse 18
4123 Allschwil / CH
Application number, filing date07720124.207.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007CH00227
Priority number, dateEP2006011390112.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06113901
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007131375
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021837
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021837
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/02, B42D15/00, G07D7/12
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCH REFLEKTIERENDE OBERFLÄCHEN-RELIEFMIKROSTRUKTUREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2009/07]
English:OPTICALLY EFFECTIVE SURFACE RELIEF MICROSTRUCTURES AND METHOD OF MAKING THEM[2009/07]
French:MICROSTRUCTURES À RELIEF DE SURFACE OPTIQUEMENT EFFICACES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
05.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2014Fee for grant paid
27.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12191370.1  / EP2565686
EP18157639.8  / EP3355087
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.12.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.04.2015  14.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [2015/21]
01.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
25.09.2017Reply to a communication from the opposition division
02.03.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1179/18
09.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2007
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
AT07.05.2016
GB07.05.2016
IT07.05.2016
ES08.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
[2018/28]
Former [2017/26]HU07.05.2007
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
AT07.05.2016
GB07.05.2016
IT07.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
Former [2017/21]BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
AT07.05.2016
IT07.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
Former [2017/13]BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
AT07.05.2016
IT07.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
NL01.06.2016
Former [2017/07]BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/03]BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
Former [2016/32]BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
Former [2016/20]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
IE07.05.2015
LU07.05.2015
Former [2016/06]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
LU07.05.2015
Former [2015/50]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/23]CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT09.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003072412  (MARTYNOV VLADIMIR V [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024]; figure 2; claim 10 *;
 [X]US2005219353  (MATSUO YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0050] , [0055] , [0095] * * figures 1a,2a *;
 [X]DE102004003984  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-30,36-42 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0018] - [0020] - [0031] , [0032] , [0047] * * figures 2-8 *;
 [X]US2005094277  (KHUSNATDINOV NIYAZ [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0766103  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [A] 22-25 * page 4, line 14 - line 51 * * figure 4 *;
 [AD]WO0129148  (ROLIC AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-30,36-42 * page 1, line 31 - page 6, line 14 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US2003011870  (OTAKE TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,31,35 * paragraphs [0099] , [0134] , [0209] - [0212]; figure 11 *;
 [X]JP2005215642  (SHIN STI TECHNOLOGY KK) [X] 1,31,35 * paragraphs [0026] - [0048] - [0070] , [0071] * * figure 3 *;
 [X]US6322938  (COHN ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1 * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 48 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]  - MARTYNOV V V ET AL, "LAMELLAR MULTILAYER GRATINGS WITH VERY HIGH DIFFRACTION EFFICIENCY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (1997), vol. 3150, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 2 - 8, XP009055430 [A] 1 * page 5, lines 5,6 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.292728
 [X]  - LEECH P W ET AL, "Microrelief structures for anti-counterfeiting applications", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200305), vol. 65, no. 4, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 439 - 446, XP004421635 [X] 1,4-6 * page 442, paragraphs 3,4 * * figures 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-9317(03)00162-X
 [A]  - PATRICK W. LEECH ET AL., "Fabrication of Hologram Coins using Electron Beam Lithography", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, (2003), vol. 777, pages T8.5.1. - T8.5.6., XP002439772 [A] 4-6 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2002034710