Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020821

EP2020821 - A RANDOM ACCESS CONTROL METHOD BASED ON TD-SCDMA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2016/52]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech IndustrialPark Nashan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yincheng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / CHEN, Hui
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / MA, Zhifeng
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2016/52]
Former [2009/06]01 / ZHANG, Yincheng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / CHEN, Hui
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / MA, Zhifeng
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
Representative(s)Ilgart, Jean-Christophe , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2016/52]
Former [2009/06]Ilgart, Jean-Christophe , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07720818.916.04.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007CN01245
Priority number, dateCN2006101184630.04.2006         Original published format: CN200610011846
[2009/06]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007128204
Date:15.11.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020821
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020821
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08
[2016/32]
Former International [2009/14]H04W4/00
Former International [2009/06]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/52]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKTZUGRIFFS-STEUERVERFAHREN AUF DER BASIS EINES TD-SCDMA-SYSTEMS[2009/06]
English:A RANDOM ACCESS CONTROL METHOD BASED ON TD-SCDMA SYSTEM[2009/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE FONDÉ SUR UN SYSTÈME TD-SCDMA[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2008Translation filed 
27.11.2008National basic fee paid 
27.11.2008Search fee paid 
27.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
27.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
04.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2016
23.06.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2016Fee for grant paid
18.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2014
Opposition(s)29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IE16.04.2017
LU16.04.2017
MT16.04.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/23]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IE16.04.2017
LU16.04.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
LU16.04.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/07]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002170013  (BOLOURCHI NADER [US], et al) [A] 10,18 * abstract *
 [XIA]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Feasibility study on uplink enhancements for UTRA TDD; (Release 6)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 25.804, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060301), no. V6.1.0, pages 1 - 79, XP050369124 [X] 1,3 * page 27 - page 29 * * page 74 - page 75 * [I] 2,4-9,11-17 [A] 10,18
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; FDD Enhanced Uplink; Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 6)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.309, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20041201), no. V6.1.0, pages 1 - 26, XP050367617 [A] 1-18 * page 8 - page 24 *
International search[A]CN1741630  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN1464754  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN1414727  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])
ExaminationUS2005266846