Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023538

EP2023538 - THE CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM OF MULTI-TRAFFIC ACCESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2012
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2012  [2012/32]
06.07.2012Change - extension statespublished on 08.08.2012  [2012/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / OUYANG, Weilong
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hengelhaupt, Jürgen , et al
Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hengelhaupt, Jürgen , et al
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date07721298.329.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007CN01725
Priority number, dateCN200616090229.05.2006         Original published format: CN200610060902
[2009/07]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137512
Date:06.12.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023538
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/56
[2009/22]
Former International [2009/07]H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:STEUERVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM EINES MEHRVERKEHRS-ZUGANGSNETZES[2009/07]
English:THE CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM OF MULTI-TRAFFIC ACCESS NETWORK[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS MULTI-TRAFIC[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008Translation filed 
28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
27.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/32]
22.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.10.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006028983  (WRIGHT STEVEN A [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 5, paragraph 125 - page 10, paragraph 183 * * page 23, paragraph 355 - page 24, paragraph 369 * * page 28, paragraph 460 - page 30, paragraph 487 * * figures 1-7,13,24-27 *;
 [X]WO2004093407  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 6, paragraph 34 - page 8, paragraph 44 * * page 12, paragraph 60 - page 25, paragraph 106 * * figures 1A,1B,3-7B *;
 [A]EP1383353  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, paragraph 3 - column 4, paragraph 21 * * column 7, paragraph 41 - column 10, paragraph 61 * * column 11, paragraph 68 - column 13, paragraph 80 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2005112363  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 16 - page 7, line 6 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 7 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]  - WG2 (EDITORS OF FGNGN-FRA), "Draft FGNGN-FRA Version 5.1 [Editor's note]", 3GPP DRAFT; FGNGN-OD-00192R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050722), vol. tsg_sa\WG5_TM\TSGS5_43\Docs, no. Bordeaux; 20050902, XP050301803 [A] 1-13 * page 6, chapter "6. The NGN architecture" * * page 27, chapter "8. Transport and Service configuration of NGN" * * figures 1,3 *
International search[X]CN1432257  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]);
 [Y]CN1340940  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]WO02073883  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]);
 [A]US2005120222  (MITSUOKA YOSHIO [JP], et al)