Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028816

EP2028816 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING A DUAL STACK MOBILE NODE TO ROAM INTO AN IPV4 NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): LV
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / GUAN, Hongguang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2013/14]
Former [2009/09]01 / GUAN, Hongguang
Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/01]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
Former [2009/35]Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Former [2009/09]Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date07721721.411.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007CN70100
Priority number, dateCN200618281109.06.2006         Original published format: CN200610082811
[2009/09]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007143955
Date:21.12.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028816
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028816
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2028816
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/12
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN EINES DUAL STACK-MOBILKNOTENS ZUM ROAMEN IN EIN IPV4-NETZ[2010/22]
English:AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING A DUAL STACK MOBILE NODE TO ROAM INTO AN IPV4 NETWORK[2009/09]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT À UN NOEUD MOBILE À PILE DOUBLE DE SE DÉPLACER VERS UN RÉSEAU IPV4[2010/22]
Former [2009/09]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN EINES ZWEISTAPEL-MOBILKNOTENS ZUM ROAMEN IN EINEM IPV4-NETZWERK
Former [2009/09]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT À UN N UD MOBILE À PILE DOUBLE DE SE DÉPLACER VERS UN RÉSEAU IPV4
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008Translation filed 
13.12.2008National basic fee paid 
13.12.2008Search fee paid 
13.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
09.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2010Fee for grant paid
13.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011  04.07.2011  WITHDRAWN
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/33]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011  04.07.2011  WITHDRAWN
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/27]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011  01.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
30.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.10.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.10.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.01.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
21.02.2013Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
HU25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE11.06.2011
LU11.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2013/50]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
HU25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE11.06.2011
LU11.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2013/45]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
HU25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE11.06.2011
LU11.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2013/44]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE11.06.2011
LU11.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2013/25]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE11.06.2011
LU11.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2013/21]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE11.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
Former [2011/29]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/26]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]CA2563911  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-14 * page 9, lines 3-29; figure 2 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 17; figure 3 *;
 [X]WO2004049668  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 9 * * page 18, line 20 - page 20, line 4 *;
 [A]  PAT R CALHOUN ET AL, "IPv6 over Mobile IPv4 ; draft-mccann-mobileip-ipv6mipv4-03.txt", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE (IETF) DRAFT, (200210), XP015004355 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2003236914  (LIU CHANGWEN [US]);
 [A]CN1691668  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]US6992994  (DAS SUBIR [US], et al);
 [A]US2005099976  (YAMAMOTO SHU [US], et al)
by applicantUS2003236914
 CA2563911
 WO2004049668