Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2040943

EP2040943 - A CHAMBER OF A PERISTALTIC PUMP FOR TIRE PRESSURE ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.12.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coda Innovations s.r.o.
Kováku 1141/11
15000 Praha 5 / CZ
[2016/21]
Former [2014/13]For all designated states
Sithold, S.R.O.
Kovaku 1141/11
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Former [2013/29]For all designated states
Coda Development, S.r.o.
Kováku° 114/11
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Former [2013/04]For all designated states
Coda Development, S.r.o.
Kováku° 114/11 150 00
Praha 5 / CZ
Former [2013/03]For all designated states
Coda Development, S.r.o.
Kováku° 150 00
Praha 5 / CZ
Former [2009/14]For all designated states
Coda Development, S.r.o.
Taborska 438/51
14000 Praha 4 / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / HRABAL, Frantisek
Kovaku 1141/11
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
 [2014/30]
Former [2009/14]01 / HRABAL, Frantisek
Nezamyslova 274/10
12000 Praha 2 / CZ
Representative(s)Rings, Rolf , et al
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/52]Kratochvil, Vaclav
Patent and Trademark Office
P.O. Box 26
295 01 Mnichovo Hradiste / CZ
Former [2009/14]Kratochvil, Vaclav
Táborská 758/33
29301 Mladá Boleslav / CZ
Application number, filing date07721824.623.05.2007
[2009/14]
WO2007CZ00035
Priority number, dateCZ2006000033523.05.2006         Original published format: CZ 20060335
[2009/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134556
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2040943
Date:01.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2040943
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:B60C23/00, B60C15/024
[2009/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAMMER EINER SCHLAUCHPUMPE ZUR REIFENDRUCKEINSTELLUNG[2009/14]
English:A CHAMBER OF A PERISTALTIC PUMP FOR TIRE PRESSURE ADJUSTMENT[2009/14]
French:CHAMBRE DE POMPE PÉRISTALTIQUE POUR LE RÉGLAGE DE PRESSION DE PNEU[2009/14]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/14]
28.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2013Fee for grant paid
11.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2014Fee for grant paid
03.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
06.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.10.2015  08.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
200 Innovation Way
Akron OH 44316 / US
Opponent's representative
Kutsch, Bernd, et al
Goodyear S.A.
Patent Department
Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
 [2015/46]
16.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0155/18
21.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
24.11.2014Request for further processing filed
24.11.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.12.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
04.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
03.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
AT23.05.2016
GB23.05.2016
IE23.05.2016
PL23.05.2016
RO23.05.2016
SK23.05.2016
ES24.05.2016
HU24.05.2016
SI24.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
DK31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT23.11.2016
GR07.12.2016
FI23.05.2017
[2018/28]
Former [2018/08]CY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
AT23.05.2016
GB23.05.2016
IE23.05.2016
PL23.05.2016
RO23.05.2016
SK23.05.2016
HU24.05.2016
SI24.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
DK31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT23.11.2016
GR07.12.2016
FI23.05.2017
Former [2017/52]CY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
AT23.05.2016
GB23.05.2016
IE23.05.2016
PL23.05.2016
RO23.05.2016
SK23.05.2016
HU24.05.2016
SI24.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
DK31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT23.11.2016
GR07.12.2016
Former [2017/31]CY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
AT23.05.2016
GB23.05.2016
IE23.05.2016
RO23.05.2016
SK23.05.2016
HU24.05.2016
SI24.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
DK31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT23.11.2016
GR07.12.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
AT23.05.2016
RO23.05.2016
SK23.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT23.11.2016
GR07.12.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
RO23.05.2016
SK23.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/06]CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/39]LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/38]LT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/36]LT07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
Former [2015/35]LT07.01.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US1134361  (WETHERELL ANSON B [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]US1050886  (WETHERELL ANSON B [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [XY]DE3433318  (MOUSIOL HANS [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,17 * pages 19-21; figures 3-6 * [Y] 3-6,9-16,18;
 [Y]WO2005012009  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 3-6,9-16,18 * from page 3, l. 12 to page 4, l. 22;; figures 1,2; claims 3,4 *
by applicantCZ20021364
 CZ20014451
 CS246152
 CS273325