Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1987592

EP1987592 - INDUCTIVE PROXIMITY SWITCH AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2012
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pepperl + Fuchs GmbH
Lilienthalstrasse 200
68307 Mannheim / DE
[2011/19]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Pepperl + Fuchs GmbH
Königsberger Allee 87
68307 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KÜHN, Thomas
Bruchsalerstr. 7
68219 Mannheim / DE
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Schiffer, Axel Martin , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Schiffer, Axel Martin , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date07721942.621.02.2007
[2008/45]
WO2007DE00327
Priority number, dateDE2006100821122.02.2006         Original published format: DE102006008211
DE2007100337423.01.2007         Original published format: DE102007003374
[2008/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007095921
Date:30.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1987592
Date:05.11.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007
[2008/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1987592
Date:27.07.2011
Language:DE
[2011/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/95, G01V3/10
[2008/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INDUKTIVER NÄHERUNGSSCHALTER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SOLCHEN[2008/45]
English:INDUCTIVE PROXIMITY SWITCH AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A SWITCH[2008/45]
French:DETECTEUR DE PROXIMITE INDUCATIF ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI[2011/30]
Former [2008/45]Détecteur de proximité inductif et procédé d'utilisation de celui-ci
Entry into regional phase25.08.2008National basic fee paid 
25.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/45]
03.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2011Fee for grant paid
08.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10014225.6  / EP2309646
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2008
Opposition(s)02.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
TR27.07.2011
BG27.10.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
AT21.02.2012
LU21.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
TR27.07.2011
BG27.10.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
AT21.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/31]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
BG27.10.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
AT21.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
BG27.10.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/22]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/04]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/42]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/33]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/23]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
EE27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
RO27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
SK27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/21]CY27.07.2011
CZ27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/20]CY27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
IE27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/12]CY27.07.2011
FI27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/11]FI27.07.2011
LT27.07.2011
LV27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
SI27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
IS27.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
Cited inInternational search[DIA]DE10012830  (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [DI] 1-4,12-15,18-22 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 41 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 30 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5-11,16,17;
 [DIA]EP0479078  (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [DI] 1-4,12-15,18-22 * page 1, line 50 - page 5, line 37 * * page 5, line 49 - page 6, line 6 * * page 6, line 53 - page 7, line 8 * [A] 5-11,16,17;
 [PA]WO2006021045  (MINELAB ELECTRONICS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [PA] 1-22 * page 22, line 8 - line 30 * * figure 4 *
by applicantDE1286099