Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023834

EP2023834 - VERTEBRAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metz-Stavenhagen, Peter
Schlossstrasse 24
34537 Bad Wildungen / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Walther Hinz Bayer PartGmbB
Heimradstrasse 2
34130 Kassel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Walther, Walther & Hinz GbR
Heimradstrasse 2
D-34130 Kassel / DE
Application number, filing date07722228.918.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007DE00670
Priority number, dateDE20062006898U29.04.2006         Original published format: DE 202006006898 U
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007124716
Date:08.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023834
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WIRBELSÄULENIMPLANTAT[2009/08]
English:VERTEBRAL IMPLANT[2009/08]
French:IMPLANT VERTÉBRAL[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2008National basic fee paid 
01.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
02.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/38]
15.08.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2016
19.10.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
14.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201105   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2011
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2005143738  (ZUCHERMAN JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * page 4, paragraph 81 - page 5, paragraph 83 * * page 6, paragraph 93 * * page 7, paragraphs 106,107 * * page 8, paragraphs 112,116-118 * * page 10, paragraphs 129-135 * * figures 18-20,34,35,48-51,59,60,64-66,74-78 * [A] 5;
 [XA]FR2722088  (CAHLIK MARC ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, lines 12-21 * * page 4, lines 1-32 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 6;
 [X]FR2738144  (CAHLIK MARC ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, lines 1-7 * * page 2, paragraphs 6-35 * * page 3, lines 18-33 * * figure 1 *;
 [PX]WO2006135889  (GLOBUS MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-9 * page 1, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 24, paragraph 108 - page 26, paragraph 111 * * figures 16-18 *
by applicantCA2320821
 EP1330987
 US2005143738