Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024526

EP2024526 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROLLING BEARING COMPONENT AND ROLLING BEARING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.02.2014  [2014/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2012/11]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TROJAHN, Werner
Nordring 16
97464 Niederwerrn / DE
02 / RÖSCH, Silke
Hainleinstrasse 42a
97464 Niederwerrn / DE
 [2009/08]
Application number, filing date07722403.810.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007DE00854
Priority number, dateDE2006102369019.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006023690
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134571
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024526
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C23C4/06, C23C4/12, F16C33/30
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄLZLAGERBAUTEILS SOWIE WÄLZLAGERBAUTEIL[2009/08]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROLLING BEARING COMPONENT AND ROLLING BEARING COMPONENT[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE PALIER DE ROULEMENT ET ÉLÉMENT DE PALIER DE ROULEMENT[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2008National basic fee paid 
25.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/07]
24.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9951790  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, lines 2-28 * * page 9, lines 4-29 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 15 * * page 16, line 20 - page 18, line 7 * * page 19, line 28 - page 20, line 14 * * pages 21-26; examples A-D *;
 [X]WO9951791  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, lines 7-32 * * page 9, lines 14-32 * * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 5 * * page 15, line 4 - page 16, line 25 * * page 17, line 25 - page 23, line 37 *;
 [A]EP0491521  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 26-42 * * page 5, lines 13-30 * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 2 * * page 8, lines 21-52 * * page 9, lines 9-39 * * page 10, lines 2-20,35-58 * * page 11, lines 16-35 * * page 11, line 50 - page 12, line 10 * * figures 4,9-11 *;
 [A]WO9747780  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 23 * * page 13, lines 9-16 * * page 15, lines 8-14 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO0196049  (BECHTEL BWXT IDAHO LLC [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, lines 17-20 * * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 4 * * page 10, lines 20-25 * * page 16, lines 6-19 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9747415  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 26-30 * * page 5, lines 6-12 * * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 21 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 8 * * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9967075  (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, lines 3-21 * * page 5, lines 1-17 *