Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027699

EP2027699 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PICTURE AND DATA UPLOAD WITH A MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2014
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NeoMedia Technologies, Inc.
100 West Arapahoe Avenue Suite 9
Boulder CO 80302 / US
[2013/32]
Former [2012/26]For all designated states
NeoMedia Europe GmbH
Jens-Otto-Krag-Strasse 11
52146 Würselen / DE
Former [2010/11]For all designated states
NeoMedia Europe AG
Jens-Otto-Krag-Strasse 11
52146 Würselen / DE
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Gavitec AG
Jens-Otto-Krag-Str. 11
52146 Würselen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MÜLLER, Frank
Am Backes 26
52074 Aachen / DE
02 / JOUSSEN, Mario
In den Weinfartsfeldern 27
52385 Nideggen-Wollersheim / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Lucas, Phillip Brian
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/26]Lucas, Phillip Brian
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Former [2009/40]Castell, Klaus
Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Former [2009/09]Castell, Klaus
Gutenbergstrasse 12
52349 Düren / DE
Application number, filing date07722480.629.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007DE00964
Priority number, dateDE2006102625202.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006026252
DE2006105040920.10.2006         Original published format: DE102006050409
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007140745
Date:13.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027699
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027699
Date:14.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04N1/00, H04N1/32
[2013/11]
Former International [2009/09]H04L29/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILD- UND DATENUPLOAD MIT MOBILEM ENDGERÄT[2009/09]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PICTURE AND DATA UPLOAD WITH A MOBILE TERMINAL[2009/09]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TÉLÉCHARGEMENT DE DONNÉES ET D'IMAGES AVEC UN TERMINAL MOBILE[2013/12]
Former [2009/09]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TÉLÉVERSEMENT DE DONNÉES ET D'IMAGES AVEC UN TERMINAL MOBILE
Entry into regional phase22.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
02.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2013Fee for grant paid
03.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.04.2009
Opposition(s)15.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.01.2010Request for further processing filed
15.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.01.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.05.2007
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU29.05.2007
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2016/25]BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2016/16]CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2015/09]CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/23]CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/22]CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/21]CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY24.07.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.07.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.07.2013
LT14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT14.08.2013
PT16.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[E]US2007130190  (YOSHIKAWA TADASHI [JP]) [E] 1-11 * paragraph 188 - column 196 *;
 [X]WO2005062186  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-11;
 [X]DE102005010146  (GAVITEC AG MOBILE DIGIT [DE]) [X] 1-11,12 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [A]WO0105047  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [XY]WO0188833  (STRATTON MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 12-15,18,19 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraphs 3-5 * [Y] 16,17;
 [X]US2002143860  (CATAN CAROLYN RAMSEY [US]) [X] 18-20 * column A * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] *;
 [XYA]US2006002607  (BONCYK WAYNE C [US], et al) [X] 18,19 * column A; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0094] , [0113] * [Y] 16,17 [A] 13;
 [X]GB2368181  (FIRSTLIGHT POSTERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 18,19 * abstract *