Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024251

EP2024251 - METHOD FOR INCREASING THE SHELF LIFE OF AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS WHICH PRODUCE ETHYLENE, DURING TRANSPORT, SALE, PRESENTATION AND/OR STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2010
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2011  [2011/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RODLER, Norbert
Erlenstrasse 3
85406 Zolling / DE
02 / FLEISCHMANN, Volker
Hauptstrasse 43a
36452 Empfertshausen / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2010/32]
Former [2009/08]Gagel, Roland
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480 a
D-81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date07722481.429.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007DE00965
Priority number, dateDE2006102549130.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006025491
DE2006103460226.07.2006         Original published format: DE102006034602
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137565
Date:06.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024251
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/26
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER HALTBARKEIT VON ETHYLEN PRODUZIERENDEN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ERZEUGNISSEN BEI TRANSPORT, VERKAUF, PRÄSENTATION UND/ODER LAGERUNG[2009/08]
English:METHOD FOR INCREASING THE SHELF LIFE OF AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS WHICH PRODUCE ETHYLENE, DURING TRANSPORT, SALE, PRESENTATION AND/OR STORAGE[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DE LA DURABILITÉ DE PRODUITS AGRICOLES PRODUISANT DE L'ÉTHYLÈNE LORS DU TRANSPORT, DE LA VENTE, DE LA PRÉSENTATION ET/OU DU STOCKAGE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
12.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/03]
27.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US5744205  (KAWAI YOSHITAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,12,13 * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 4 * * column 13, line 1 - line 15; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2004039683  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,11,12 * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,4-6; claims 1,2,10 *