Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1996815

EP1996815 - WIND TURBINE WITH A PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR AND USE HEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/49]PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR, WIND TURBINE AND USE HEREOF
[2016/12]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 42
8200 Aarhus N / DK
[2015/23]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8900 Randers / DK
Inventor(s)01 / HELLE, Lars
Hjedsbæksvej 475
DK-9541 Suldrup / DK
02 / NIEUWENHUIZEN, John, Johannes Mathias, Hubertus
Kirkeskovvej 21
DK-8700 Horsens / DK
03 / LINDHOLM, Morten
Snebærvej 24
DK-8270 Højbjerg / DK
04 / OTTESEN, Jari
Ny Munkegade 101, 3TH
DK-8000 Århus C / DK
 [2009/16]
Former [2008/49]01 / HELLE, Lars
Hjedsbæksvej 475
DK-9541 Suldrup / DK
02 / NIEUWENHUIZEN, John, Johannes Mathias, Hubertus
Kirkeskovvej 21
DK-8700 Horsens / DK
03 / LINDHOLM, Morten
Snebærvej 24
DK-8270 Højbjerg / DK
04 / OTTESEN, Jari
Bissensgade 11, 4. th.
DK-8000 Århus C / DK
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Former [2008/49]Schmidt, Jens Joergen , et al
Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date07722543.119.03.2007
[2008/49]
WO2007DK00137
Priority number, dateDK2006000038317.03.2006         Original published format: DK 200600383
[2008/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007107158
Date:27.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1996815
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007
[2008/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1996815
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/28, F03D7/02, F03D1/06, H02J3/38
[2016/12]
Former International [2008/49]F03D1/06, F03D7/02, F03D11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WINDTURBINE MIT EINEM SCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EINEN STROMGENERATOR, UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2016/12]
English:WIND TURBINE WITH A PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR AND USE HEREOF[2016/12]
French:EOLIENNE AVEC UN SYSTEME DE PROTECTION POUR GENERATEUR ELECTRIQUE ET SON UTILISATION[2016/12]
Former [2008/49]SCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EINEN STROMGENERATOR, WINDTURBINE UND VERWENDUNG
Former [2008/49]PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR, WIND TURBINE AND USE HEREOF
Former [2008/49]SYSTEME DE PROTECTION POUR GENERATEUR ELECTRIQUE, EOLIENNE ET SON UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase08.07.2008National basic fee paid 
08.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
21.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2013Fee for grant paid
14.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2014  31.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  23.01.2014  30.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
VEM Sachsenwerk GmbH
Pirnaer Landstraße 176
01257 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Drechsler, Gottfried
Ilberg & Weissfloh
Patentanwälte
Prellerstrasse 26
01309 Dresden / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2014   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  23.01.2014  30.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
VEM Sachsenwerk GmbH
Pirnaer Landstraße 176
01257 Dresden / DE
Opponent's representative
Drechsler, Gottfried
Ilberg & Weissfloh
Patentanwälte
Prellerstrasse 26
01309 Dresden / DE
04.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1503/16
02.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
01.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1503/16
26.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
06.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
07.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.03.2007
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU19.03.2007
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
LU19.03.2014
Former [2014/14]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2331858  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [X] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 17; figure 4; claims 16,17 * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 17; figure 4; claims 16,17 * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 17; figure 4; claims 16,17 *;
 [A]EP1318589  (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1589630  (PILLER POWER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1036937  (HITACHI LTD [JP]; HITACHI ENG SERVICE [JP]) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1568883  (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]; STEMMANN TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *