Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021653

EP2021653 - A TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tomactech A/S
Produktionstorvet 424
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PEDERSEN, Troels
Ternevej 2
2990 Nivá / DK
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Ho̸rsholm / DK
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Inspicos A/S
Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45
2970 Ho̸rsholm / DK
Application number, filing date07722588.630.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007DK00209
Priority number, dateDK2006000060930.04.2006         Original published format: DK 200600609
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007124753
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021653
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021653
Date:26.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:F16H1/36, F16H57/08
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesAL01.12.2008
BA01.12.2008
HR01.12.2008
MK01.12.2008
RS01.12.2008
TitleGerman:GETRIEBE[2009/07]
English:A TRANSMISSION[2009/07]
French:TRANSMISSION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2008National basic fee paid 
01.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.02.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
03.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2009Fee for grant paid
08.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
MT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
TR26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
HU27.02.2010
IE30.04.2010
LU30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
MT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
HU27.02.2010
IE30.04.2010
LU30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
MT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
HU27.02.2010
IE30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/25]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
MT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
IE30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/28]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/27]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/19]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/18]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
LT26.08.2009
LV26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
PL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
IS26.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1262683  (ZF PADOVA S P A [IT]) [X] 1-5,1-5,1-5 * figures 1,2 * * figures 1,2 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE3903517  (MUCHNA MARIA [DE]) [X] 1-5,1-5,1-5 * figure 2 * * figure 2 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]DE10161942  (HIRN THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,1-3,5,1-3,5 * figure 1 * * figure 1 * * figure 1 *