Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021652

EP2021652 - TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2012
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2012  [2012/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dtu, Technical University Of Denmark
Anker Egelundsvej 1 Building 101A
2800 Lyngby / DK
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KLIT, Peter
No̸rredamsvej 124
DK-3480 Fredensborg / DK
02 / SANTOS, Ilmar Ferreira
Kroghsgade 1, 1st right
DK-2100 Copenhagen O̸ / DK
03 / NISSEN, Rasmus Thranberg
Rektorparken 12, 9th left
DK-2450 Copenhagen NV / DK
04 / HANSEN, Henrik Baldur No̸rregård
Musvågevej 18, 3rd left
DK-2400 Copenhagen NV / DK
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Münzer, Marc Eric
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Münzer, Marc Eric
Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date07722627.230.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007DK00250
Priority number, dateEP2006038803830.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06388038
US20060803445P30.05.2006         Original published format: US 803445 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007137580
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021652
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/14, F16F9/53
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesAL26.11.2008
BA26.11.2008
HR26.11.2008
MK26.11.2008
RS26.11.2008
TitleGerman:DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER[2009/07]
English:TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER[2009/07]
French:AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS DE TORSION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
23.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/13]
08.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DX]JPS63190945  (NIPPON FERROFLUIDICS KK) [DX] 1,2,7,8 * abstract *;
 [DX]US5191811  (KOGURE TOSHIHARU [JP]) [DX] 1-11 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [DX]EP0872665  (TRW INC [US]) [DX] 1,2,7,10 * abstract *;
 [DX]JPH01266336  (NISSAN MOTOR) [DX] 1,2,7,10 * abstract *;
 [DA]US4200003  (MILLER DONALD L [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9607836  (LORD CORP [US]);
 [DA]US2650684  (ENGLISH JR JAMES F, et al);
 [DA]US5598908  (YORK TODD M [US], et al);
 [A]US2004022467  (ROBB SCOTT B [US], et al)
by applicantEP0980991
 JPH01266336
 US2650684
 US5589908
 EP0872665
 WO9607836
 US4200003
 US5191811
 JPS63190945B