Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1991972

EP1991972 - RADIO RECEIVER AND TRANSMITTER APPARATUS FOR RADIO- CONTROLLED AUTOMATION SYSTEMS FOR OPENING/CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NICE S.P.A.
Via Pezza Alta 13
31046 Rustigne' di Oderzo (Treviso) / IT
[2010/36]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
NICE SpA
Via Pezza Alta 13
31046 Rustigne' di Oderzo (Treviso) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / MARCHETTO, Oscar
Via Cesare Battisti, 3/10
I-31046 Oderzo / IT
02 / BORTOLAN, Bruno
Via Chiesa Ponzano, 2
I-31050 Ponzano Veneto / IT
03 / CAMPAGNARO, Paolo
Via Pozzo Dipinto, 55
I-33098 Valvasone / IT
04 / FREGONESE, Stefano
Via Monticano, 4/8
I-31040 Mansue' / IT
 [2008/47]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07723002.702.03.2007
[2008/47]
WO2007EP01807
Priority number, dateIT2006MI0040907.03.2006         Original published format: IT MI20060409
[2008/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007101619
Date:13.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1991972
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007
[2008/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1991972
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G08C17/02, G08C19/28
[2008/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNKEMPFÄNGER- UND SENDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FUNKGESTEUERTES AUTOMATIKSYSTEM ZUM ÖFFNEN/SCHLIESSEN[2008/47]
English:RADIO RECEIVER AND TRANSMITTER APPARATUS FOR RADIO- CONTROLLED AUTOMATION SYSTEMS FOR OPENING/CLOSURE[2008/47]
French:APPAREIL ÉMETTEUR-RÉCEPTEUR RADIO POUR SYSTÈMES D'OUVERTURE ET FERMETURE AUTOMATISÉS COMMANDÉS PAR RADIO[2008/47]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2008National basic fee paid 
27.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/47]
11.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2010Fee for grant paid
12.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SOMFY SAS
50 avenue du Nouveau Monde
74300 Cluses / FR
Opponent's representative
Novaimo
Bâtiment Europa 2
310 avenue Marie Curie
Archamps Technopole
74166 Saint-Julien-en-Genevois Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2013/07]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
SOMFY SAS
50 avenue du Nouveau Monde
74300 Cluses / FR
Opponent's representative
Novaimo
Bâtiment Europa 2
310 avenue Marie Curie
Archamps Technopole
74166 Saint Julien en Genevois Cedex / FR
Former [2011/28]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011   
SOMFY SAS
50 avenue du Nouveau Monde
74300 Cluses / FR
Opponent's representative
Aivazian, Denis
Aivazian Moreau - Novaimo B.P. 50038
F-74802 La Roche-sur-Foron Cedex / FR
14.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1189/15
20.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
16.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201004   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LU02.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LU02.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2013/42]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LU02.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/27]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/26]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO2006048435  (E C E SA ETUDE CONCEPT ELECTRO [FR], et al) [PX] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - page 4, line 20 * * page 7, lines 17-20 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US6324089  (SYMOEN LIONEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 19 * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0348726  (NOKIA UNTERHALTUNGSELEKTRONIK [DE]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 48 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2685505  (TEXTON [FR]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005081079  (NICE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *