Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1991972 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1991972



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1097
16.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.12.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.12.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.12.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
27.05.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.12.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.12.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 31
10.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 31
29.07.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.07.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
06.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.06.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
03.06.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.05.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
20.03.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 20
20.03.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
20.03.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2015 Claims Opposition 3
03.02.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
09.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
09.01.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.01.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.01.2015 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
02.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
02.01.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.01.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.01.2015 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
31.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.12.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.12.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
09.12.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
11.08.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.08.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.08.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
28.12.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
30.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2012 Claims Opposition 5
30.01.2012 Claims Opposition 5
30.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
24.01.2012 Claims Opposition 5
24.01.2012 Claims Opposition 5
24.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
19.01.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
08.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 94
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.06.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
12.08.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
12.01.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
12.01.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
12.01.2010 Letter concerning the grant and printing fee Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.09.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
11.09.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
06.08.2009 General enquiry Search / examination 1
17.06.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2009 General enquiry Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.10.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.10.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
27.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2008 Annex Search / examination 1
27.03.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
03.10.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
13.09.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.09.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
02.03.2007 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
02.03.2007 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
02.03.2007 Description PCT receiving Office 19
02.03.2007 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5