Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1991972


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.12.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.07.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
15.06.2015 Change: Appeal number
03.06.2015 New entry: Appeal number
03.06.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.03.2015 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
20.03.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.03.2015 Deletion: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
10.03.2015 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
01.08.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
13.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
11.01.2013 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
26.01.2012 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2011 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2011  [2011/34]
11.07.2011 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
10.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
10.06.2011 Opposition filed published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
03.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2011  [2011/27]
27.05.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.06.2011  [2011/26]
06.08.2010 (Expected) grant published on  08.09.2010  [2010/36]
03.08.2010 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
03.08.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.06.2010 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.01.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.01.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.09.2009 Change - extension states published on  07.10.2009  [2009/41]
01.09.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
17.10.2008 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
07.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
18.04.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
04.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
15.09.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication