Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2001859 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2001859



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 147
25.03.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.10.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
01.10.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.10.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
10.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Description Search / examination 14
10.07.2009 Description Search / examination 11
10.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.05.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.10.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
13.10.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
01.10.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.09.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.09.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
22.09.2008 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.06.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.06.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.06.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.06.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.06.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.06.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.06.2008 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.01.2008 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
21.11.2007 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
25.10.2007 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.10.2007 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.10.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
02.10.2007 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.10.2007 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
20.09.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
20.09.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
22.08.2007 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
04.07.2007 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.04.2007 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.04.2007 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
23.04.2007 Description PCT receiving Office 8