Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2008113393

WO2008113393 - MICRO PLASMA REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010PCT data prior to European publication 
19.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tavakoli Keshe, Mehran
51 Kapellestraat
8573 Tiegem / BE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[N/P]
Application number, filing date07723555.422.03.2007
WO2007EP02607
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008113393
Date:25.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008
[2008/39]
Search report(s)
ClassificationInternational:G21B1/00, G21K1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR 
TitleEnglish:MICRO PLASMA REACTOR
French:MICRORÉACTEUR À PLASMA
Examination procedure23.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/16]
30.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2010/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
22.10.200903   M06   Not yet paid