Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2007293

EP2007293 - MULTI-FUNCTION DEVICE FOR ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.01.2014  [2014/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ERBE Elektromedizin GmbH
Waldhörnlestrasse 17
72072 Tübingen / DE
[2013/04]
Former [2009/01]For all designated states
Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH
Waldhörnlestrasse 17
72072 Tübingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHER, Klaus
Immengasse 1
72202 Nagold / DE
 [2009/01]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/01]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07723942.403.04.2007
[2009/01]
WO2007EP03001
Priority number, dateDE2006101701411.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006017014
DE2006102787316.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006027873
[2009/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007118608
Date:25.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2007293
Date:31.12.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007
[2009/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2007293
Date:23.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/3203, A61B18/14, // A61B18/12
[2012/33]
Former International [2009/01]A61B17/32, A61B18/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/19]
Former [2009/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ENDOSKOPISCHES MULTIFUNKTIONS-CHIRURGIEGERÄT[2009/01]
English:MULTI-FUNCTION DEVICE FOR ENDOSCOPIC SURGERY[2009/01]
French:INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL MULTIFONCTIONS ENDOSCOPIQUE[2009/01]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2008National basic fee paid 
11.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
12.11.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.12.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
16.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2012Fee for grant paid
11.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2010
Opposition(s)24.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0280972  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * columns 4-5; figures 4-6 *;
 [Y]DE102004020855  (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure 14 *;
 [Y]DE102004013419  (PENTAX CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE4420608  (DELMA ELEKTRO MED APP [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 10; figures 6-8 *;
 [A]DE3715418  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP1790299