Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2007974

EP2007974 - MUFFLER FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faurecia Emissions Control Technologies, Germany GmbH
Biberbachstrasse 9
86154 Augsburg / DE
[2013/47]
Former [2009/01]For all designated states
EMCON Technologies Germany (Augsburg) GmbH
Biberbachstrasse 9
86154 Augsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TREFZGER, Erik
Dekan-Neuwirth-Strasse 2a
86698 Oberndorf / DE
 [2009/01]
Representative(s)Prinz & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/02]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/01]Kitzhofer, Thomas
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07723946.503.04.2007
[2009/01]
WO2007EP03005
Priority number, dateDE2006101781213.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006017812
[2009/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007118609
Date:25.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2007974
Date:31.12.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007
[2009/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2007974
Date:12.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/08, F01N3/20
[2016/17]
Former International [2009/01]F01N1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR [2009/19]
Former [2009/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALLDÄMPFER FÜR EINE ABGASANLAGE[2009/01]
English:MUFFLER FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM[2009/01]
French:SILENCIEUX POUR SYSTÈME DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT[2009/01]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2008National basic fee paid 
11.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
14.11.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.12.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2010Fee for grant paid
24.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
J. EBERSPÄCHER GMBH & CO. KG
Eberspächerstrasse 24
D-73730 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater, et al
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 02  14.02.2011  17.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Tenneco GmbH
Luitpoldstrasse 83
67480 Edenkoben / DE
Opponent's representative
Thews, Karl
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews
Patentanwälte
Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/39]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
J. EBERSPÄCHER GMBH & CO. KG
Eberspächerstrasse 24
D-73730 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 02  14.02.2011  17.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Tenneco GmbH
Luitpoldstrasse 83
67480 Edenkoben / DE
Opponent's representative
Thews, Karl
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2011/12]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
J. EBERSPÄCHER GMBH & CO. KG
Eberspächerstrasse 24
D-73730 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 02  14.02.2011  17.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HEINRICH GILLET GMBH
Luitpoldstr. 83
67480 Edenkoben / DE
Opponent's representative
Thews, Karl
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2011/11]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2011  10.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
J. EBERSPÄCHER GMBH & CO. KG
Eberspächerstrasse 24
D-73730 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
18.03.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.08.2011Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2011Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition27.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1567/16
23.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES23.08.2010
[2011/25]
Cited inInternational search[X]US2520756  (BRYANT EDWIN E) [X] 1,5,9,11 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 26; figure 2 *;
 [X]US3340957  (VAUTAW ROBERT L ET AL) [X] 1,9,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2940538  (BILLEY LEINO H) [X] 1,7,9,11 * column 3, line 31 - column 3, line 48 *;
 [X]DE10120974  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US4111279  (STERRETT DALE E) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5926954  (WOLF JERRY M [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 34; figure 12 *