Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2008218

EP2008218 - RECORDING RESOURCE USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
[2009/01]
Inventor(s)01 / OESTER, Heiko
Hutstrasse 52
91301 Forchheim / DE
 [2009/09]
Former [2009/01]01 / OESTER, Heiko
Wasserturmstrasse 57A
85737 Ismaning / DE
Application number, filing date07724119.810.04.2007
[2009/01]
WO2007EP03178
Priority number, dateDE2006101699411.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006016994
[2009/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007118638
Date:25.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2008218
Date:31.12.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007
[2009/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00
[2009/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/01]
TitleGerman:ERFASSEN DES BETRIEBSMITTELVERBRAUCHS[2009/01]
English:RECORDING RESOURCE USAGE[2009/01]
French:DÉTECTION DE L'UTILISATION DE RESSOURCES[2009/01]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2008National basic fee paid 
11.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
17.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/23]
29.11.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/23]
Appeal following examination28.11.2013Appeal received No.  T0820/14
17.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
29.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
29.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9301550  (INFOLOGIC SOFTWARE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * siehe Verweise auf dem Formblatt PCT/ISA/206 *;
 [X]EP0852349  (ISOGON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * column 8, line 2 - column 9, line 9 * * column 10, line 27 - column 12, line 25 * * column 13, line 45 - column 14, line 21 * * column 14, line 46 - column 15, line 52 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 5 * * column 16, line 40 - column 17, line 10 *