EP2024650 - FLUID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydac Process Technology GmbH Industriegebiet, Grube König, Am Wrangelflöz 1 66538 Neunkirchen / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WNUK, Ralf Am Heidehügel 13 66450 Bexbach/Kleinottweiler / DE | 02 /
OLSCHOK, Markus Hyazinthenweg 2 66450 Neunkirchen / DE | 03 /
SAUER, Jürgen Felsenrech 9 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/24] |
Former [2009/08] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner, Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724223.8 | 13.04.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007EP03283 | Priority number, date | DE20061026077 | 03.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006026077 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007140840 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024650 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024650 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F15B21/04, B01D29/11 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
F15B13/0814 (EP,US);
F15B21/04 (KR);
B01D29/11 (KR);
B01D29/33 (EP,US);
B01D29/445 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (EP,US);
B01D29/668 (EP,US);
F15B13/0892 (EP,US);
F15B21/041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDSYSTEM | [2009/08] | English: | FLUID SYSTEM | [2009/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FLUIDE | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2007 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | CY | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE19734588 (BOLL & KIRCH FILTER [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figure 1; claims 1-5 * [I] 8-10; | [AD]DE19934574 (SCHAEL WILFRIED [DE]) [AD] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]WO0189659 (BOLL & KIRCH FILTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [I]WO2005072845 (HYDAC PROCESS TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 1; claims 1-8 * | Examination | DE10353888 | by applicant | DE19734588 | DE19934574 | WO0189659 |