EP2024445 - LOW-VOC HUMECTANT FOR AQUEOUS PIGMENT PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2009/23] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHRENS, Hendrik Rossertstrasse 78 65830 Kriftel / DE | 02 /
EFFING, Jochem Haingraben 18C 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
AHRENS, Hendrik Neu-Zeilsheim 89 65931 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
EFFING, Jochem Haingraben 18C 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724364.0 | 19.04.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007EP03427 | Priority number, date | DE20061021178 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006021178 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007128388 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2024445 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/04 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C09B67/0089 (EP);
C09B67/006 (EP);
C09B67/0063 (EP);
C09B67/0084 (EP);
C09C1/48 (EP);
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D17/001 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOC-ARME FEUCHTHALTEMITTEL FÜR WÄSSRIGE PIGMENTPRÄPARATIONEN | [2009/08] | English: | LOW-VOC HUMECTANT FOR AQUEOUS PIGMENT PREPARATIONS | [2009/08] | French: | AGENT MOUILLANT A FAIBLE TENEUR EN COV POUR PREPARATIONS AQUEUSES DE PIGMENTS | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0218504 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-12 * page 1, lines 6-9,21-29 * * page 10, line 38 - page 11, line 5 * * page 12, lines 1-37 * * examples 1,4 *; | [XD]DE19842952 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-12 * page 5, lines 67,68 * * page 6, lines 50-56 * * page 7, lines 7-23 * * example 6 *; | [X]WO2005017047 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 10, lines 13-24,29-33 * * page 10, line 38 - page 11, line 25 * * example 1b * * claims 1-4,6-9 *; | [X]EP0259130 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-12 * column 4, lines 34-38 * * examples 1,2,4-6 * * claims 1,7 *; | [E]WO2007087961 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH], et al) [E] 1-12 * page 1, lines 3-11 * * page 10, lines 4-12 * * page 11, lines 4-13 * * page 15, lines 4-19 * * examples 1-5 * |