Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027728

EP2027728 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CREATION OF PSEUDO-HOLOGRAPHIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2014
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sterrix Technologies UG
Rademacher Kamp 5
21255 Kakenstorf / DE
[2013/22]
Former [2011/15]For all designated states
Spatial View Inc
144 Front Street West, Suite 785
Toronto, ON M5J 2L7 / CA
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Spatial View GmbH
Fiedlerstrasse 36
01307 Dresden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KAMINS-NASKE, Sigrid
Rademacher Kamp 5
21255 Kakenstorf / DE
02 / NASKE, Ivo-Henning
Rademacher Kamp 5
21255 Kakenstorf / DE
03 / NASKE, Valerie Antonia
Rademacher Kamp 5
21255 Kakenstorf / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann
PartG mbB
Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/04]Ullrich & Naumann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [2009/09]Ullrich & Naumann
Luisenstraße 14
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date07724476.223.04.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP03546
Priority number, dateDE2006101916921.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006019169
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007121970
Date:01.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027728
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027728
Date:22.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, G06T15/20
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PSEUDOHOLOGRAPHISCHEN BILDERZEUGUNG[2009/09]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CREATION OF PSEUDO-HOLOGRAPHIC IMAGES[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'IMAGES PSEUDOHOLOGRAPHIQUES[2013/28]
Former [2009/09]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'IMAGES PSEUDOHOLOGRAPHIQUE
Entry into regional phase14.11.2008National basic fee paid 
19.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
13.06.2009Observations by third parties
19.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.03.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2013Fee for grant paid
27.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2010
Opposition(s)23.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
03.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201307   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.04.2007
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
IT22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
TR22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU23.04.2007
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
IT22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/29]BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
IT22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/28]BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
GR23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/25]BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/16]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/38]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
AT23.04.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/24]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/21]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/01]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
LU23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/52]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
PL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
DK22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
NL22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY22.01.2014
ES22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
SE22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2004100464  (OH TEIK [AU], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0049] * [Y] 3-6;
 [Y]  - HUANG H-C ET AL, "GENERATION OF MULTIVIEWPOINT VIDEO FROM STEREOSCOPIC VIDEO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199902), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 124 - 134, XP000888364 [Y] 3-6 * page 129, column 2, paragraph L - page 130, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.754427
 [X]  - HENDRIKS E A ET AL, "REAL TIME SYNTHESIS OF DIGITAL MULTI VIEWPOINT STEREOSCOPIC IMAGES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19990125), vol. 3639, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 266 - 276, XP008021883 [X] 7-9 * page 269 - page 270 * * page 273, paragraph 2 - page 274; figure 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.349389
by applicantUS2004100464
    - "Real Time Synthesis of Digital Multi Viewpoint Stereoscopic Images", INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION THERORY GROUP, DEPARTMENT OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING, FACULTY OF OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND SYSTEMS, page 2628