Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027284

EP2027284 - USE OF ADAMTS4 GENE AND PROTEIN POLYMORPHISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.09.2014  [2014/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANOFI
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]For all designated states
SANOFI
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2012/17]For all designated states
SANOFI
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2011/30]For all designated states
SANOFI
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis
174 Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / KOZIAN, Detlef
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / HERRMANN, Matthias
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / SIEGLER, Karl-Ernst
Horst-Schork-Strasse 19
67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / DELEUZE, Jean-François
Sanofi-Aventis S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
05 / RICARD, Sylvain
Sanofi-Aventis S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
06 / MACE, Sandrine
Sanofi-Aventis S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Schneider, Rudolf , et al
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Global Intellectual Property Department
Industriepark Höchst
Gebäude K 703
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Schneider, Rudolf , et al
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patente Deutschland Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 801
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date07725018.109.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP04095
Priority number, dateDE2006102325318.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006023253
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134718
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027284
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ADAMTS4-GEN- UND -PROTEIN-POLYMORPHISMEN[2009/09]
English:USE OF ADAMTS4 GENE AND PROTEIN POLYMORPHISMS[2009/09]
French:UTILISATION DU GÈNE ADAMTS4 ET DE POLYMORPHISMES DE PROTÉINES[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2008National basic fee paid 
18.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
18.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0132926  (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 2,3,6-40,42,46-48 * abstract * * page 19, line 18 - line 31; figure 14; table 4 * * page 45, line 12 - page 46, line 16 *;
 [X]WO2004011637  (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [X] 2,3,6-40,42,44 * abstract * * page 22, line 29 - page 25, line 12; examples 1,9,10 *;
 [A]WO03066822  (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-45,48 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6753176  (ARNER ELIZABETH C [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - DATABASE GENESEQ, Database accession no. ADS20209, URL: GSP, XP002456450 [X] 45-48 * column A *
 [X]  - DATABASE GENESEQ, Database accession no. AAG78228, URL: GSP, XP002456447 [X] 46-48 * column A *
 [X]  - DATABASE Geneseq, Database accession no. ADB85488, URL: GSP, XP002456448 [X] 46-48 * column A *
 [X]  - DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. BD508090, URL: JPOP, XP002456449 [X] 46-48 * column A *
 [X]  - DATABASE USPTO PROTEINS, Database accession no. AAV19427, URL: USPOP, [X] 45-48 * column A *
 [A]  - WIGHT THOMAS N, "The ADAMTS proteases, extracellular matrix, and vascular disease: waking the sleeping giant(s)!", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY JAN 2005, (200501), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 1524-4636, pages 12 - 14, XP002456444 [A] 1-49 * page 12, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 13, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - GLASSON SONYA S ET AL, "Characterization of and osteoarthritis susceptibility in ADAMTS-4-knockout mice.", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM AUG 2004, (200408), vol. 50, no. 8, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2547 - 2558, XP002456445 [A] 1-49 * abstract * * page 2555, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 2556, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2557, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.20558
 [A]  - SANDY JOHN D ET AL, "Versican V1 proteolysis in human aorta in vivo occurs at the Glu441-Ala442 bond, a site that is cleaved by recombinant ADAMTS-1 and ADAMTS-4", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010420), vol. 276, no. 16, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13372 - 13378, XP002456446 [A] 1-49 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M009737200
 [XP]  - KENAGY ET AL, "Versican Degradation and Vascular Disease", TRENDS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200608), vol. 16, no. 6, ISSN 1050-1738, pages 209 - 215, XP005550663 [XP] 2,3,6-40,42,46-48 * abstract * * page 210, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 213, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 214, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcm.2006.03.011