Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019973

EP2019973 - DISTANCE MEASURING METHOD AND DISTANCE METER FOR DETERMINING THE SPATIAL DIMENSION OF A TARGET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/06]DISTANCE MEASURING METHOD AND DISTANCE MEASURING ELEMENT FOR DETECTING THE SPATIAL DIMENSION OF A TARGET
[2017/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2018 [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Geosystems AG
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ROHNER, Marcel
Mittelbissauweg 1
CH-9410 Heiden / CH
02 / AEBISCHER, Beat
Weedstrasse 5
CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH
03 / JENSEN, Thomas
Mühletobelstr. 31
CH-9400 Rorschach / CH
04 / SIERCKS, Knut
Augartenstr. 29
CH-9402 Mörschwill / CH
 [2009/12]
Former [2009/06]01 / ROHNER, Marcel
Mittelbissauweg 1
CH-9410 Heiden / CH
02 / AEBISCHER, Beat
Weedstrasse 5
CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH
03 / JENSEN, Thomas
Mühletobelstr. 31
CH-9400 Rorschach / CH
04 / SIERCKS, Knut
Kreuzbühlstr. 42
CH-9015 St. Gallen / CH
Representative(s)Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
[2017/47]
Former [2009/06]Büchel, Kaminski & Partner
Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79
9490 Vaduz / LI
Application number, filing date07725096.711.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007EP04176
Priority number, dateEP2006011439923.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114399
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134730
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2019973
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019973
Date:22.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/89, G01S17/10, G01S7/487, G01S7/486, // G01S7/497
[2017/26]
Former International [2009/06]G01S17/89, G01S17/10, G01S7/487
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/47]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DISTANZMESSVERFAHREN UND DISTANZMESSER ZUR ERFASSUNG DER RÄUMLICHEN ABMESSUNG EINES ZIELES[2009/06]
English:DISTANCE MEASURING METHOD AND DISTANCE METER FOR DETERMINING THE SPATIAL DIMENSION OF A TARGET[2017/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE DISTANCES ET APPAREIL DE MESURE DE DISTANCES DESTINÉS À L'ENREGISTREMENT DES DIMENSIONS SPATIALES D'UNE CIBLE[2017/26]
Former [2009/06]DISTANCE MEASURING METHOD AND DISTANCE MEASURING ELEMENT FOR DETECTING THE SPATIAL DIMENSION OF A TARGET
Former [2009/06]PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE DISTANCE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE DISTANCE PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER LA DIMENSION SPATIALE D'UNE CIBLE
Entry into regional phase02.10.2008National basic fee paid 
02.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
30.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2017Fee for grant paid
09.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2014
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
[2018/43]
Former [2018/41]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/39]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/26]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/23]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[YA]US6535275  (MCCAFFREY NATHANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,8-16 * abstract * * column 2, lines 59-67 * * column 3, lines 1-9,64-67 * * column 4, lines 6-10,30-36,51-56 * * column 5, lines 7-9,18-33,64-67 * * column 6, lines 1-8 * [A] 3,5-7,17;
 [YA]US4816669  (ANDERSEN OLE R [DK]) [Y] 1,2,4,8-16 * column 1, lines 45-51,65-68 * * column 2, lines 1-6 * * column 3, lines 20-26,32-48 * * column 4, lines 3-24 * [A] 3,5-7,17;
 [A]EP0703465  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, lines 39-59 * * column 2, lines 1-20,46-51 *;
 [A]US5892575  (MARINO RICHARD M) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 2, lines 46-63 * * column 5, lines 40-44,56-67 * * column 6, lines 1-5 * * column 13, lines 20-24 *;
 [AD]US6115112  (HERTZMAN N P MIKAEL [SE], et al) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [AD]  - NICLASS C ET AL, "A CMOS 3D camera with millimetric depth resolution", CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 2004 ORLANDO, FL, USA OCT. 3-6, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041003), ISBN 0-7803-8495-4, pages 705 - 708, XP010742419 [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CICC.2004.1358925