Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023884

EP2023884 - METHOD AND MEANS FOR INFILTRATING ENAMEL LESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Charité Universitätsmedizin Berlin
Charitéplatz 1
10117 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Mühlbauer Technology GmbH
Elbgaustraße 248
22547 Hamburg / DE
[2014/36]
Former [2012/24]For all designated states
Charité Universitätsmedizin Berlin
Charitéplatz 1
10117 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Ernst Mühlbauer GmbH & Co.KG
Koogstraat 4
25870 Norderfriedrichskoog / DE
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Ernst Mühlbauer GmbH & Co.KG
Koogstraat 4
25870 Norderfriedrichskoog / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MEYER-LUECKEL, Hendrik
Kopenhagener Strasse 21
10437 Berlin / DE
02 / PARIS, Sebastian
Lindenallee 102
16816 Neuruppin / DE
03 / MUELLER, Jan
Waldstrasse 16
15754 Königs-Wusterhausen / DE
04 / KIELBASSA, Andrej
Sauerbruchstrasse 19a
14109 Berlin / DE
05 / DETJE, Bernd
Schleswiger Strasse 3
22761 Hamburg / DE
 [2017/16]
Former [2009/08]01 / MEYER-LUECKEL, Hendrik
Kopenhagener Strasse 21
10437 Berlin / DE
02 / PARIS, Sebastian
Lindenallee 102
16816 Neuruppin / DE
03 / MUELLER, Jan
Waldstrasse 16
15754 Königs-Wusterhausen / DE
04 / KIELBASSA, Andrij, M.
Sauerbruchstrasse 19a
14109 Berlin / DE
05 / DETJE, Bernd
Schleswiger Strasse 3
22761 Hamburg / DE
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/12]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/08]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date07725124.711.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP04204
Priority number, dateUS2006043227111.05.2006         Original published format: US 432271
EP2006002196619.10.2006         Original published format: EP 06021966
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007131725
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023884
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023884
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2023884
Date:07.06.2017
[2017/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/00, A61K6/08, G01N11/06, G01N13/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/12]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR INFILTRATION VON SCHMELZLÄSIONEN[2017/18]
English:METHOD AND MEANS FOR INFILTRATING ENAMEL LESIONS[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET MOYENS SERVANT À INFILTRER DES LÉSIONS DANS L'ÉMAIL[2009/08]
Former [2009/08]VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR INFILTRATION VON EMAIL-LÄSIONEN
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2017Fee for grant paid
02.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.03.2017Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)EP12002385.8  / EP2476404
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2010
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
IE11.05.2017
IT11.05.2017
LU11.05.2017
MT11.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
IE11.05.2017
IT11.05.2017
LU11.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/28]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
IE11.05.2017
IT11.05.2017
LU11.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
IE11.05.2017
LU11.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/17]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU11.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2542198  (RIZHSKIJ MED INST [SU]) [A] 1-32 * page 1, line 1 - line 13 * * claim - *;
 [PX]US2006167129  (MEYER-LUCKEL HENDRIK [DE], et al) [PX] 1-32 * column 12 - column 50 * * example - * * claim - *
 [XA]  - MEYER-LUECKEL ET AL, "Influence of the application time on the penetration of different dental adhesives and a fissure sealant into artificial subsurface lesions in bovine enamel", DENTAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, (200601), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0109-5641, pages 22 - 28, XP005214018 [X] 1-21 * the whole document * [A] 22-32

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dental.2005.03.005