Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024211

EP2024211 - COMPRESSED AIR SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[2017/28]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FRIES, Ansgar
Seydlitzstrasse 40
80993 München / DE
02 / HILBERER, Eduard
Am Damm 5
68766 Hockenheim / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Mattusch, Gundula
C/o Knorr-Bremse AG
Moosacherstrasse 80
80809 München / DE
[2017/28]
Former [2009/08]Mattusch, Gundula
C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80
80809 München / DE
Application number, filing date07725333.416.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP04419
Priority number, dateDE2006102360619.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006023606
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134795
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024211
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024211
Date:12.07.2017
Language:DE
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/02, B60T8/36, F16K31/06
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/28]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKLUFTVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG[2009/08]
English:COMPRESSED AIR SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN AIR COMPRIMÉ POUR UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
04.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2017Fee for grant paid
09.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2017
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/43]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
Cited inInternational search[DY]DE3923882  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [DY] 1-16 * column 1, line 68 - column 4, line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO0242136  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 4; figures 2a-2c *;
 [A]EP1508488  (HALDEX BRAKE PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3233545  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicantDE3923882