Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024594

EP2024594 - INSULATING GLASS UNIT WITH AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Opposition rejectedpublished on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
[2011/48]
Former [2010/03]For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
For all designated states
Bystronic Lenhardt GmbH
Karl-Lenhardt-Strasse 1-9
75242 Neuhausen-Hamberg / DE
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
For all designated states
Lenhardt Maschinenbau GmbH
Karl-Lenhardt-Strasse 1-9
75242 Neuhausen-Hamberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WOLF, Andreas
Asternweg 14
65510 Huenstetten / DE
02 / THOMAS, Richard, Henry
5 Court Drive
Llansannor
Cowbridge
Vale of Glamorgan CF71 7SD / GB
03 / PUSCHMANN, Klaus
Brunnengasse 12
76669 Bad Schonborn / DE
04 / SCHULER, Peter
Hofstatte 7
75233 Tiefenbronn / DE
 [2011/51]
Former [2009/08]01 / WOLF, Andreas
Asternweg 14
65510 Huenstetten / DE
02 / THOMAS, Richard, Henry
5 Court Drive Llansannor Cowbridge
Vale of Glamorgan CF71 7SD / GB
03 / PUSCHMANN, Klaus
Brunnengasse 12
76669 Bad Schonborn / DE
04 / SCHULER, Peter
Hofstatte 7
75233 Tiefenbronn / DE
Representative(s)Donlan, Andrew Michael
Dow Corning Limited
Intellectual Property Departement
Cardiff Road
Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 2YL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]Donlan, Andrew Michael
Dow Corning Limited
Cardiff Road
Barry, Vale of Glamorgan CF63 2YL / GB
Former [2011/51]Davies, Peter Vaughan
Hazelhurst Highfield Road
Monmouth NP25 3HR / GB
Former [2009/08]Davies, Peter Vaughan
Hazelhurst Highfield Road
Monmouth NP25 3HR / GB
Application number, filing date07725387.019.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP04479
Priority number, dateGB2006001063430.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0610634
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137719
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024594
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024594
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/66, G09F3/18
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:ISOLIERGLASEINHEIT MIT EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2009/08]
English:INSULATING GLASS UNIT WITH AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION[2009/08]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ISOLATION EN VERRE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT SA PRODUCTION[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2008National basic fee paid 
03.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
26.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2011Fee for grant paid
04.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.09.2012  17.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AGC Glass Europe
Avenue Jean Monnet 4
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
Opponent's representative
Bayot, Daisy
AGC Glass Europe
Technovation Centre
IP Department
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
 [2014/25]
Former [2012/42]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2012   
AGC Glass Europe
Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166
1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE
Opponent's representative
Bayot, Daisy
AGC Glass Europe S.A.
R&D Centre
Rue de l'Aurore, 2
BE-6040 Jumet / BE
26.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.05.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2014
07.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2015Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/26]
20.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.02.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
IE19.05.2012
LU19.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
IE19.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/35]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
IE19.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
IE19.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/37]CY21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/35]CY21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT21.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO0036261  (CATRAME FR S A R L [FR], et al) [DA] 1-17 * page 3, line 10 - page 6, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6275157  (MAYS WESLEY M [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2005103430  (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 8, lines 1-30; figure 1 *;
 [PA]WO2006114543  (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [PA] 1-17 * abstract *