Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024744

EP2024744 - MICROTITER PLATE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.04.2015
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.05.2015  [2015/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
m2p-labs GmbH
Arnold-Sommerfeld-Ring 2
52499 Baesweiler / DE
[2013/37]
Former [2013/27]For all designated states
M2p-labs GmbH
Arnold-Sommerfeld-Ring 2
52499 Baesweiler / DE
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
RWTH Aachen
Templergraben 55
52062 Aachen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÜCHS, Jochen
Franzstrasse 95
52064 Aachen / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Kohlmann, Kai
Donatusstrasse 1
52078 Aachen / DE
[2009/08]
Application number, filing date07725400.121.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP04493
Priority number, dateDE2006102501126.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006025011
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137722
Date:06.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024744
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50, B01L3/00, C12M1/36
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:MIKROTITERPLATTE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2009/08]
English:MICROTITER PLATE AND USE THEREOF[2009/08]
French:PLAQUE MICROTITRE ET SON UTILISATION[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2008National basic fee paid 
17.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
11.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/20]
07.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6627406  (SINGH SHARAT [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * column 13, paragraphs 14-31 * * column 14, lines 8-19 * * column 16, lines 62-66 * * column 15, line 21 - column 16, line 48 * * figures 1-3,6-13 * * column 31, line 54 - column 34, line 16 * * column 6, lines 39-65 * * column 12, lines 37-50 *;
 [X]US2002168757  (KIRK GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0059] , [0061] - [0064]; figures 1-14 * * paragraphs [0101] - [0105] * * paragraph [0070] *;
 [X]WO02081085  (MICRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0040] *;
 [X]WO2005097969  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15-24 * page 18, line 15 - page 21, line 5 * * page 22, lines 2-29 * * page 23, lines 16-25; figure 3 * * page 29, lines 20-31 *;
 [X]US5422270  (CASPI RACHEL R [US]) [X] 1,3,8,20-24 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]DE9419230U  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19806681
 US2002168757
 US2004077075
    - CHEMIE INGENIEUR TECHNIK, vol. 68, page 11,96,