Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024465

EP2024465 - NEW MATERIALS FOR ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BACH, Ingrid
Im Lorsbachtal 14
65719 Hofheim / DE
02 / BUESING, Arne
Liederbacherstrasse 5
65959 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / HEUN, Suanne
Am Carlusbaum 23
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / STOESSEL, Philipp
Sophienstrasse 30
60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE
05 / HOLBACH, Michael
Wallstrasse 91
61440 Oberursel / DE
06 / KROEBER, Jonas
Fahrgasse 4
60311 Frankfurt / DE
07 / PARHAM, Amir Hossain
Franz-Henle-Strasse 4
65929 Frankfurt / DE
 [2009/13]
Former [2009/08]01 / BACH, Ingrid
Im Lorsbachtal 14
65719 Hofheim / DE
02 / BUESING, Arne
Liederbacherstrasse 5
65959 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / HEUN, Suanne
Am Carlusbaum 23
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / STOESSEL, Philipp
Sophienstrasse 30
60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE
05 / HOLBACH, Michael
Suedliche Ringstrasse 50
63225 Langen / DE
06 / KROEBER, Jonas
Fahrgasse 4
60311 Frankfurt / DE
07 / PARHAM, Amir Hossain
Franz-Henle-Strasse 4
65929 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date07725406.821.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP04499
Priority number, dateDE2006102577731.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006025777
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137725
Date:06.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024465
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024465
Date:13.01.2016
Language:DE
[2016/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/06, C09B17/00, C09B19/00, C09B21/00, C09B57/00
[2015/28]
Former International [2009/08]C09K11/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/02]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE MATERIALIEN FÜR ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENZVORRICHTUNGEN[2009/08]
English:NEW MATERIALS FOR ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICES[2009/08]
French:NOUVEAUX MATÉRIAUX POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS ORGANIQUES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2008National basic fee paid 
01.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
27.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.08.2015Fee for grant paid
24.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2009
Opposition(s)14.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.05.2007
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
AT21.05.2016
GB21.05.2016
IE21.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]HU21.05.2007
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
AT21.05.2016
GB21.05.2016
IE21.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU21.05.2007
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
AT21.05.2016
GB21.05.2016
IE21.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/38]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
AT21.05.2016
GB21.05.2016
IE21.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/26]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
GB21.05.2016
IE21.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/20]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/13]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/04]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
LU21.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/49]DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/46]DK13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/38]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL13.01.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004093207  (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * examples 44-47 *;
 [DX]JP2005154396  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [DX] 1-16 * paragraphs [0071] - [0075] *;
 [X]JP2003267976  (KANAGAWA KAGAKU GIJUTSU AKAD) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] *;
 [X]EP1489154  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-7 *
 [X]  - FIELD J E ET AL, "Bridged Triarylamines: A New Class of Heterohelicenes", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (2003), vol. 68, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 6071 - 6078, XP002425435 [X] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo026883p