Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026946

EP2026946 - HOT-RUNNER NOZZLE FOR ARRANGEMENT IN AN INJECTION MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/09]INJECTION NOZZLE, IN PARTICULAR HOT-RUNNER NOZZLE, FOR ARRANGEMENT IN AN INJECTION MOULD
[2013/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Günther Heisskanaltechnik GmbH
Sachsenberger Strasse 1
35066 Frankenberg/Eder / DE
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / GÜNTHER, Herbert
Unterauestrasse 14
35108 Allendorf/Rennertehausen / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger
Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross
Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten
Hammerstrasse 3
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger
Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3
57072 Siegen / DE
Former [2009/09]Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger
Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date07725447.223.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP04547
Priority number, dateDE2006102658008.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006026580
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007140878
Date:13.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026946
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026946
Date:08.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/27
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEISSKANALDÜSE ZUR ANORDNUNG IN EINEM SPRITZGIESSWERKZEUG[2013/35]
English:HOT-RUNNER NOZZLE FOR ARRANGEMENT IN AN INJECTION MOULD[2013/35]
French:BUSE À CANAL CHAUD DEVANT ÊTRE DISPOSÉE DANS UN OUTIL DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION[2013/35]
Former [2009/09]SPRITZGUSSDÜSE, INSBESONDERE HEISSKANALDÜSE, ZUR ANORDNUNG IN EINEM SPRITZGIESSWERKZEUG
Former [2009/09]INJECTION NOZZLE, IN PARTICULAR HOT-RUNNER NOZZLE, FOR ARRANGEMENT IN AN INJECTION MOULD
Former [2009/09]BUSE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION, NOTAMMENT BUSE À CANAL CHAUD, DEVANT ÊTRE DISPOSÉE DANS UN OUTIL DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
15.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2013Fee for grant paid
27.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2012
Opposition(s)09.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.05.2007
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT23.05.2014
GB23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT23.05.2014
GB23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2016/25]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT23.05.2014
GB23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2016/16]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT23.05.2014
GB23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2015/38]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT23.05.2014
GB23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2015/24]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
GB23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT08.01.2014
IS08.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0018559  (GELLERT JOBST U [CA]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 14 - line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE3523826  (GELLERT JOBST U [CA]) [X] 1-6 * page 17, line 9 - line 14 * * page 10, line 10 - line 14; figure 10 *;
 [X]US6009616  (GELLERT JOBST ULRICH [CA]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 38 - line 67; figure 4 *;
 [X]EP0480224  (GELLERT JOBST U [CA]) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 6 - line 15; figure 1 *
by applicantDE3523826
 WO0018559
 US6009616
 EP0480224
 DE19542237
 EP0528315
 DE10004072