Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022292

EP2022292 - EAR INSERT, IN PARTICULAR HEARING AID EAR INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2012  [2012/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEERS Hörakustik AG & Co. KG
Otto-Hahn-Strasse 35
44227 Dortmund / DE
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MÜLLER, Thomas
Robert-Koch-Strasse 11
47229 Duisburg / DE
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07725722.831.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007EP04841
Priority number, dateDE2006102571801.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006025718
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137855
Date:06.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022292
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00, A61F11/08
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OHREINSATZ, INSBESONDERE HÖRGERÄTEOHREINSATZ[2009/07]
English:EAR INSERT, IN PARTICULAR HEARING AID EAR INSERT[2009/07]
French:ÉCOUTEUR, EN PARTICULIER ÉCOUTEUR POUR PROTHÈSES AUDITIVES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2008National basic fee paid 
29.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/25]
11.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0076271  (INSONUS MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * claims 1-60 *;
 [X]US6724902  (SHENNIB ADNAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15,17 * abstract *;
 [X]US2005117765  (MEYER JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14,17,21 * abstract *;
 [X]US2002196958  (HALTEREN AART ZEGER VAN [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14,17-21 * abstract *;
 [X]GB925889  (LOUIS ULYSSE SANTI) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract *