Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024091

EP2024091 - ROLLER PRESS, IN PARTICULAR FOR INTERPARTICLE CRUSHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KHD Humboldt Wedag GmbH
Colonia-Allee 3
51067 Köln / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / STRASSER, Siegfried
Gerlinghausen 69
53804 Much / DE
02 / ENDERS, Andreas
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 2
59302 Oelde / DE
03 / LIEDTKE, Silke
Forstwaldstrasse 168
47804 Krefeld / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/50]
Application number, filing date07725735.001.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP04855
Priority number, dateDE2006102583302.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006025833
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007140929
Date:13.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024091
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024091
Date:12.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B02C4/28, B30B15/30
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:ROLLENPRESSE INSBESONDERE ZUR GUTBETTZERKLEINERUNG[2009/08]
English:ROLLER PRESS, IN PARTICULAR FOR INTERPARTICLE CRUSHING[2009/08]
French:PRESSE À ROULEAUX NOTAMMENT POUR LE BROYAGE D'UN LIT DE MATIÈRE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2008National basic fee paid 
27.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
05.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2012Fee for grant paid
25.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2011
Opposition(s)13.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.06.2007
CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
MC12.12.2012
MT12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT01.06.2013
GB01.06.2013
IE01.06.2013
LU01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/13]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
MC12.12.2012
MT12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT01.06.2013
GB01.06.2013
IE01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/51]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
MC12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
AT01.06.2013
GB01.06.2013
IE01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/21]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
MC12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
GB01.06.2013
IE01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/20]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
MC12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
IE01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
MC12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2014/03]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
IT12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2013/52]CY12.12.2012
CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2013/40]CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
PT12.04.2013
Former [2013/37]CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
NL12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
RO12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/36]CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
PL12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ12.12.2012
EE12.12.2012
LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
SK12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/34]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
BG12.03.2013
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
IS12.04.2013
Former [2013/26]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
SI12.12.2012
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
Former [2013/24]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
GR13.03.2013
ES23.03.2013
Former [2013/23]LT12.12.2012
LV12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
ES23.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT12.12.2012
SE12.12.2012
Former [2013/20]LT12.12.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005035479  (GUZMANN MARCUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * page 2, paragraph 37 - paragraph 41 * * figure 2 * [Y] 3,4;
 [X]DE10144109  (BAHR MICHAEL K [DE], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 3, paragraph 18 - paragraph 23 * * figure - *;
 [Y]DE1247123  (RETTENMAIER & SOEHNE J) [Y] 3 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE639194  (SCHUECHTERMANN & KREMER) [Y] 4 * figure - *