Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2032607

EP2032607 - PROTEOLYTICALLY CLEAVABLE FUSION PROTEIN COMPRISING A BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2017Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.02.2017  [2017/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
[2017/08]
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / METZNER, Hubert
Im Boden 6
35041 Marburg / DE
02 / WEIMER, Thomas
Richard-Wagner-Strasse 8
35075 Gladenbach / DE
03 / SCHULTE, Stefan
Bauerbacher Strasse 46
35043 Marburg / DE
 [2009/11]
Representative(s)Hauser, Hans-Peter , et al
CSL Behring GmbH Patents & Licenses Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
[2017/08]
Former [2014/04]Lauppe, Hans Friedrich
CSL Behring GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 12 30
35002 Marburg / DE
Former [2009/52]Lauppe, Hans Friedrich
CSL Behring GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 12 30
35002 Marburg / DE
Former [2009/11]Lauppe, Hans Friedrich
CSL Behring GmbH Patents & Licenses Postfach 1230
35002 Marburg / DE
Application number, filing date07726010.714.06.2007
[2009/11]
WO2007EP05246
Priority number, dateEP2006001226214.06.2006         Original published format: EP 06012262
US20060819620P11.07.2006         Original published format: US 819620 P
[2009/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144173
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2032607
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2032607
Date:22.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2032607
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07K19/00, C12N15/62
[2009/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2009/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PROTEOLYTISCH SPALTBARES FUSIONSPROTEIN, DAS EINEN BLUTGERINNUNGSFAKTOR ENTHÄLT[2009/11]
English:PROTEOLYTICALLY CLEAVABLE FUSION PROTEIN COMPRISING A BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR[2009/11]
French:PROTÉINE DE FUSION POUVANT SUBIR UN CLIVAGE PROTÉOLYTIQUE ET CONTENANT UN FACTEUR DE COAGULATION SANGUINE[2009/11]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2009National basic fee paid 
14.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/11]
24.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2013Fee for grant paid
10.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10168453.8  / EP2256135
EP19162362.8
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.10.2014  27.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Predazzi, Valentina
c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A.
Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 [2016/15]
Former [2014/48]
Opponent(s)01  22.10.2014   
Predazzi, Valentina
c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A.
Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
Opponent's representative
Predazzi, Valentina, et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39
00186 Roma / IT
28.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.08.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.09.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.01.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition09.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1414/16
08.08.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.06.2007
BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
GR23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
GR23.04.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/25]BG22.01.2014
CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2016/16]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
MT22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/24]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SI22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2015/09]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
MC22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
SK22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
RO22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY22.01.2014
CZ22.01.2014
EE22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
LV22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY22.01.2014
FI22.01.2014
LT22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
PT22.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT22.01.2014
IS22.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1444986  (AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-33 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 25 *;
 [Y]WO2004101739  (SYNTONIX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-33 * abstract * * page 49 *;
 [Y]WO2004021861  (LAUERMANN VIT [US]) [Y] 1-33 * abstract * * page 2 - page 3 *;
 [A]WO9601653  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 7 * * pages 19-22 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2004101740  (SYNTONIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - SHEFFIELD W P ET AL, "Effects of genetic fusion of factor IX to albumin on in vivo clearance in mice and rabbits", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (200408), vol. 126, no. 4, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 565 - 573, XP002395198 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2004.05106.x
by applicantWO0179271
 WO0204598
 WO03059935
 WO2004081053
 WO2004101740
 WO2005001025
 WO9109125
 WO03068934
 US4784950
 WO2005024044
    - SHEFFIELD W.P. ET AL., BR. J. HAEMATOL., (2004), vol. 126, pages 565 - 573,
    - ALEDORT L.M., J THROMB HAEMOST, (2004), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 1700 - 1708,
    - WHITE GC ET AL., RECOMBINANT FACTOR IX. THROMB HAEMOST, (1997), vol. 78, pages 261 - 265,
    - EWENSTEIN BM ET AL., "Pharmacokinetic analysis of plasma-derived and recombinant F IX concentrates in previously treated patients with moderate or severe hemophilia B", TRANSFUSION, (2002), vol. 42, pages 190 - 197,
    - MOLLERUP ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1995), vol. 48, pages 501 - 505,
    - BEATTIE; DUGAICZYK, GENE, (1982), vol. 20, pages 415 - 422,
    - LICHENSTEIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 18149 - 18154,
    - COOKE; DAVID, J. CLIN. INVEST, (1985), vol. 76, pages 2420 - 2424,
    - WASLEY LC ET AL., "PACE/Furin can process the vitamin K-dependent pro-factor IX precursor within the secretory pathway", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 8458 - 8465,