Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1997261

EP1997261 - METHOD, MODULE AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING DATA PACKET FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.05.2013  [2013/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2012/23]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
46, Quai A. Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JEANNE, Ludovic
11 square de Setubal
F-35200 Rennes / FR
02 / FONTAINE, Patrick
7 square Delestraint
F-35200 Rennes / FR
03 / GUGUEN, Charline
Résidence l'Orangerie
2, le Clos de l'Erable
35230 Bourgbarré / FR
 [2012/23]
Former [2009/11]01 / JEANNE, Ludovic
11 square de Setubal
F-35200 Rennes / FR
02 / FONTAINE, Patrick
7 square Delestraint
F-35200 Rennes / FR
03 / GUGUEN, Charline
Résidence l'Orangerie 2, le Clos de l'Erable
35230 Bourgbarré / FR
Former [2008/49]01 / JEANNE, Ludovic
11 square de Setubal
F-35200 Rennes / FR
02 / FONTAINE, Patrick
7 square Delestraint
F-35200 Rennes / FR
03 / GUGUEN, Charline
155F avenue de Général Leclerc
F-35700 Rennes / FR
Representative(s)Le Dantec, Claude
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]Le Dantec, Claude
Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2009/27]Le Dantec, Claude
Thomson European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2008/49]Le Dantec, Claude
46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Application number, filing date07726691.407.03.2007
[2008/49]
WO2007EP52133
Priority number, dateFR2006005084113.03.2006         Original published format: FR 0650841
[2008/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007104686
Date:20.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1997261
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007
[2008/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1997261
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L7/04
[2008/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/14]
Former [2008/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, MODUL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN VON DATENPAKETRAHMEN[2008/49]
English:METHOD, MODULE AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING DATA PACKET FRAMES[2008/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ, MODULE ET APPAREIL CONÇUS POUR RECEVOIR DES TRAMES DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES[2008/49]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2008National basic fee paid 
18.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
14.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.11.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
03.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2012Fee for grant paid
18.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12169518.3  / EP2493110
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2010
Opposition(s)07.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0074282  (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,13,14 * abstract * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 10 * * page 13, line 30 - page 14, line 3 * * figures 3B,8 * [Y] 3-5,8-12;
 [XY]WO9737509  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,6,13,14 * abstract * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 20 * * page 8, line 19 - page 11, line 17 * * figures 6,8-11 * [Y] 3-5,8-12;
 [XA]US5570368  (MURAKAMI MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,13,14 * abstract * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 30 * * column 16, line 31 - line 54 * * figures 4,5,19 * [A] 3-5,8-12;
 [XAY]US6819658  (AGARWAL ANIL K [US], et al) [X] 1,7,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 48 * * column 10, line 39 - line 53 * * column 16, line 3 - column 18, line 40 * * figures 1A,1B,8A,8B,13B,13C * [A] 6,13 [Y] 3-5,8-12;
 [XAY]EP0486919  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [X] 1,7,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8-13 [Y] 8