EP2004874 - METHOD FOR COATING OF METALLIC COIL OR SHEETS FOR PRODUCING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/52] | METHOD FOR COATING OF METALLIC COIL OR SHEETS FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW ARTICLES | ||
[2016/15] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIETZORECK, Hardy Werner-Bockelmann-Strasse 86 65934 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
WENDEL, Thomas Avrille Strasse 11 65824 Schwalbach / DE | 03 /
ERIKSSON, Mats Åttingsgatan 6 S-44252 Ytterby / SE | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Hübner, Günter, et al Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727286.2 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP52812 | Priority number, date | US20060396268 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 396268 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007113141 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004874 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2004874 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/34, C23C22/36, C23C22/73, B21D22/20, B21D51/26 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
C23C22/34 (EP,US);
C23C22/361 (EP,US);
C23C22/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLBÄNDERN ODER -BLECHEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | [2016/15] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING OF METALLIC COIL OR SHEETS FOR PRODUCING CONTAINERS | [2016/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT D'UNE BOBINE OU DE FEUILLES METALLIQUES DESTINE A PRODUIRE DES RECIPIENTS | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLBÄNDERN ODER -BLECHEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLARTIKELN | ||
Former [2008/52] | METHOD FOR COATING OF METALLIC COIL OR SHEETS FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW ARTICLES | ||
Former [2008/52] | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT D'UNE BOBINE OU DE FEUILLES METALLIQUES DESTINE A PRODUIRE DES ARTICLES CREUX | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 16.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/37] | 12.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.10.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/13] | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 20.05.2016 | Appeal received No. T1246/16 | 18.07.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2007 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BE | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | IE | 23.03.2014 | LU | 23.03.2014 | GB | 23.03.2020 | SE | 24.03.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | GR | 08.10.2020 | [2021/22] |
Former [2021/10] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
SE | 24.03.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB663100 (PARKER RUST PROOF CO) [A] 1-23 * claim - *; | [XA]US5603754 (AOKI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 23 * example -; claim - * [A] 1-22; | [A]WO9805804 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 2; example - *; | [A]WO0231064 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-23* example 40; claim - * | by applicant | US5603754 | WO9805804 |