Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021664

EP2021664 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUXEMBOURG PATENT COMPANY S.A.
24, route de Diekirch
7440 Lintgen / LU
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MUZZO, Paul
1, rue du Gymnase
57970 Yutz / FR
02 / KREMER, Paul
7, rue de la Libération
7263 Helmsange / LU
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[2009/27]
Former [2009/07]Ocvirk, Philippe , et al
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date07728796.904.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007EP54343
Priority number, dateEP2006011352804.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06113528
[2009/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007128791
Date:15.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021664
Date:11.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021664
Date:17.03.2010
Language:FR
[2010/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16K1/30, F17C13/04
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VENTIL[2009/07]
English:VALVE[2009/07]
French:ROBINET[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2008National basic fee paid 
03.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
28.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2010Fee for grant paid
02.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
IE17.03.2010
IT17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
MT17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
TR17.03.2010
MC31.05.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
ES28.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
HU18.09.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]AT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
IE17.03.2010
IT17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
MT17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
MC31.05.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
ES28.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
HU18.09.2010
Former [2011/25]AT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
IE17.03.2010
IT17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
MT17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
MC31.05.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
ES28.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
Former [2010/45]AT17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
Former [2010/43]AT17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0708281  (PARTECA SRL [IT]) [X] 1,3,5,15,18-20 * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-10 *;
 [XY]EP0129085  (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,7-10,12,15 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 18; figure - * [Y] 11;
 [Y]GB2121470  (SEMPELL RHEIN ARMATUREN) [Y] 11 * figure 1 *;
 [X]GB191004534  (NICHOLSON EDWARD GEORGE, et al) [X] 1,19 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 46; figure - *