Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024576

EP2024576 - PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LENGERT, Jörg
Schwalbenstr. 6
91475 Lonnerstadt-Ailsbach / DE
02 / LUTZ, Roland
Spitzwegstr. 5
91056 Erlangen / DE
03 / WEINBERG, Norbert
Kastanienweg 25
91083 Baiersdorf / DE
 [2009/08]
Application number, filing date07728802.504.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP54349
Priority number, dateDE2006102576231.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006025762
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137927
Date:06.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024576
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024576
Date:30.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:E03B5/04, E03B5/06, E21B43/12, F04C13/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PUMPVORRICHTUNG[2009/08]
English:PUMP DEVICE[2009/08]
French:DISPOSITIF DE POMPAGE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2008National basic fee paid 
05.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2010Fee for grant paid
22.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.06.2010
DK30.06.2010
EE30.06.2010
FI30.06.2010
IE30.06.2010
LT30.06.2010
LV30.06.2010
MT30.06.2010
NL30.06.2010
PL30.06.2010
RO30.06.2010
SE30.06.2010
SI30.06.2010
SK30.06.2010
BG30.09.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/05]CY30.06.2010
DK30.06.2010
EE30.06.2010
FI30.06.2010
IE30.06.2010
LT30.06.2010
LV30.06.2010
MT30.06.2010
NL30.06.2010
PL30.06.2010
RO30.06.2010
SE30.06.2010
SI30.06.2010
SK30.06.2010
Former [2011/25]CY30.06.2010
DK30.06.2010
EE30.06.2010
FI30.06.2010
IE30.06.2010
LT30.06.2010
LV30.06.2010
NL30.06.2010
PL30.06.2010
RO30.06.2010
SE30.06.2010
SI30.06.2010
SK30.06.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004062658  (BECK THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3 - page 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1132620  (FRIEDR FLENDER GMBH A [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6079491  (STUEBINGER LON A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US5147530  (CHANDLER JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *