Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021006

EP2021006 - USE OF FLIBANSERIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF POST-MENOPAUSAL SEXUAL DESIRE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sprout Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1010
Raleigh, NC 27609 / US
[2015/33]
Former [2012/11]For all designated states
Sprout Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1010
Raleigh NC 27609 / US
Former [2009/07]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
For:DE 
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / POLLENTIER, Stephane
Boschmansweg 17
1871 AW Schoorl / NL
02 / PYKE, Robert
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
900 Ridgebury Road
P.O.Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
 [2015/33]
Former [2009/07]01 / POLLENTIER, Stephane
Boschmansweg 17
1871 AW Schoorl / NL
02 / PYKE, Robert
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road
P.O.Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
Representative(s)Hally, Anna-Louise
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]Hally, Anna-Louise
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2012/16]Hally, Anna-Louise
FRKelly 27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2009/07]Hammann, Heinz
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date07728833.007.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007EP54380
Priority number, dateUS20060746817P09.05.2006         Original published format: US 746817 P
US20060830987P14.07.2006         Original published format: US 830987 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007128802
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021006
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021006
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/496, A61P15/12, A61P15/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesBA12.12.2008
HR12.12.2008
RS12.12.2008
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON FLIBANSERIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON POSTMENOPAUSALEN STÖRUNGEN DES SEXUELLEN VERLANGENS[2009/07]
English:USE OF FLIBANSERIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF POST-MENOPAUSAL SEXUAL DESIRE DISORDERS[2009/07]
French:UTILISATION DE FLIBANSERINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES DE LA LIBIDO POST-MENOPAUSIQUES[2015/15]
Former [2009/07]UTILISATION DE FLIBANSÉRINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES DE LA LIBIDO POST-MÉNOPAUSIQUES
Entry into regional phase09.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
14.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.02.2015
05.02.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2015Fee for grant paid
29.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2009
Opposition(s)13.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.06.2013Request for further processing filed
19.06.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.07.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.02.2011Request for further processing filed
21.02.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.03.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.04.2012Request for further processing filed
17.04.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.04.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.02.2010Request for further processing filed
02.02.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
IS12.12.2015
LU07.05.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]CY12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
IS12.12.2015
LU07.05.2016
Former [2017/04]IS12.12.2015
LU07.05.2016
Former [2016/10]IS12.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2005007166  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 12 * * page 7, lines 21-23 * * claims 1,9,10 * [Y] 1-16;
 [Y]WO03035072  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claim - *;
 [A]WO2005102343  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim - *;
 [A]  - FOURCROY J L, "Female sexual dysfunction: Potential for pharmacotherapy", DRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, AT, (2003), vol. 63, no. 14, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 1445 - 1457, XP009050771 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-200363140-00002