Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024081

EP2024081 - COMPOSITIONS USED ESPECIALLY FOR TRAPPING NITROGEN OXIDES (NOX) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.12.2014
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhodia Opérations
40, rue de La Haie Coq
93306 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/14]For all designated states
Rhodia Opérations
40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers / FR
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Rhodia Recherches et Technologies
52 Rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ROHART, Emmanuel
7 rue de la Sablière
F-17220 Sainte Soulle / FR
02 / PITOIS, Claire
9 rue Pasteur
F-95520 Osny / FR
03 / YOKOTA, Kazuhiko
2-2-9 1003 Ikuta-cho Chuo-ku
Kobe 651-0092 / JP
04 / BELLIERE-BACA, Virginie
9 rue de l'Ile de France
F-78570 Andresy / FR
05 / HARLE, Virginie
7 impasse Bellevue
F-60300 Senlis / FR
 [2009/13]
Former [2009/08]01 / ROHART, Emmanuel
7 rue de la Sablière
F-17220 Sainte Soulle / FR
02 / PITOIS, Claire
9 rue Pasteur
F-95520 Osny / FR
03 / YOKOTA, Kazuhiko
2-2-9 1003 Ikuta-cho Chuo-ku
Kobe 651-0092 / JP
04 / BELLIERE-BACA, Virginie
23bis rue de l'Eglise
F-78570 Andresy / FR
05 / HARLE, Virginie
7 impasse Bellevue
F-60300 Senlis / FR
Representative(s)Senninger, Thierry , et al
Rhodia Operations
Département Brevets
Bureau 0.121
40, rue de la Haie Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Dubruc, Philippe
Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07728853.807.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP54400
Priority number, dateFR2006000435616.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0604356
[2009/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007131902
Date:22.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024081
Date:18.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/06, B01J23/00, B01J20/08, B01J21/04, B01J23/10, B01J23/42, B01J37/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE INSBESONDERE ZUM ABFANGEN VON STICKSTOFFOXIDEN (NOX) VERWENDET WERDEN[2009/08]
English:COMPOSITIONS USED ESPECIALLY FOR TRAPPING NITROGEN OXIDES (NOX)[2009/08]
French:COMPOSITIONS À BASE D'ALUMINE, CERIUM ET BARYUM OU/ET STRONTIUM UTILISEES NOTAMMENT POUR LE PIEGEAGE D'OXYDES D'AZOTE (NOX)[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2008National basic fee paid 
01.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
28.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0329302  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,8-13,15-18,21,24,26 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 20; examples 1-11; claims 1-5,8,9 *;
 [X]US5212130  (ADDIEGO WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11 * figure 2; examples 2-5 *