Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021449

EP2021449 - ENCAPSULATED BLEACHING AGENT PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2013
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIEDEL, Peter
Graudenzer Strasse 27
40599 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / VÖLKEL, Heinz-Jürgen
Piusweg 37
40764 Langenfeld / DE
03 / KAISER, Heribert
Fleher Str. 181
40223 Düsseldorf / DE
04 / RYBINSKI VON, Wolfgang
Leinenweberweg 12
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
05 / HÖLSKEN, Sören
Am Steinebrück 17c
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
06 / BLANK, Volker
Tempelhofer Strasse 98
51375 Leverkusen / DE
07 / GUCKENBIEHL, Bernhard
Kasseler Weg 107
50769 Köln / DE
 [2009/07]
Application number, filing date07728980.910.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007EP54528
Priority number, dateDE2006102393719.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006023937
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134977
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021449
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021449
Date:16.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/22, C11D3/39, C11D17/00, B01J13/04, B01J2/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERKAPSELTE BLEICHMITTELTEILCHEN[2009/07]
English:ENCAPSULATED BLEACHING AGENT PARTICLES[2009/07]
French:PARTICULES D'AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT ENCAPSULÉES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2008National basic fee paid 
16.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.10.2012Fee for grant paid
25.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2010
Opposition(s)17.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.05.2007
CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
MT16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
GB10.05.2013
IE10.05.2013
LU10.05.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/13]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
MT16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
GB10.05.2013
IE10.05.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/21]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
GB10.05.2013
IE10.05.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/20]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IE10.05.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/14]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/08]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/03]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/52]CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/49]DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/48]DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/40]FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/38]FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/37]FI16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT16.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9714780  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-18 * page 1; example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP1634944  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,12-18 * paragraph [0066]; claim - * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0027] *;
 [X]WO9704936  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,12,15-17 * page 12 - page 13; claim - * * page 15 - page 16 *;
 [X]WO2006034758  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,12,15-17 * page 5 - page 6; claim - * * page 8 - page 9 *;
 [X]GB1390503  (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1-18 * page 2 - page 3; example -; claim - *;
 [DA]EP0510761  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,11 * claim - *;
 [PX]WO2007031387  (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [PX] 1-7,12-18 * page 13; example -; claim - * * page 20 *
by applicantEP0436971
 WO9714780
 WO2006034758
 GB1390503
 US6855681
    - THE ANALYST, (1962), vol. 87, page 420,