Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020102

EP2020102 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMISSION OF DATA WITH AT LEAST TWO RADIATION SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
[2013/16]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
OSRAM GmbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [2012/29]For all designated states
OSRAM AG
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RANDEL, Sebastian
Otkerstrasse 34
81547 München / DE
02 / ROHDE, Harald
Schüleinstr. 8
81673 München / DE
 [2009/06]
Application number, filing date07729119.314.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007EP54667
Priority number, dateDE2006102442124.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006024421
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135014
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020102
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020102
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/114, G08C23/04
[2015/44]
Former International [2009/06]H04B10/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN MIT WENIGSTENS ZWEI STRAHLUNGSQUELLEN[2009/06]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TRANSMISSION OF DATA WITH AT LEAST TWO RADIATION SOURCES[2009/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES AVEC AU MOINS DEUX SOURCES DE RAYONNEMENT[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2008National basic fee paid 
10.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
30.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2016Fee for grant paid
18.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.05.2007
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
AT14.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
BG16.06.2016
GB16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]HU14.05.2007
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
AT14.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
BG16.06.2016
GB16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU14.05.2007
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
AT14.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
BG16.06.2016
GB16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
AT14.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
BG16.06.2016
GB16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
BG16.06.2016
GB16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/20]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
BG16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/04]CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9013067  (ILID PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0247292  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US7006768  (FRANKLIN PHILIP G [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002167701  (HIRATA SHOJI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004247323  (MORIOKA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8802203  (VOKAC PETER R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - KITAMOTO N ET AL, "Parallel combinatory multiple-subcarrier optical communication systems", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2002. THE 13TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEPT. 15-18, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020915), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-7589-0, pages 998 - 1002, XP010611412 [A] 1-11 * abstract *