Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023915

EP2023915 - BORRELIDIN DERIVATIVES AS ANTIPROLIFERATIVE AGENTS AND ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.05.2011  [2011/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biotica Technology Limited
Chesterford Research Park, Little Chesterford Nr Saffron Walden
Essex CB10 1XL / GB
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / WILKINSON, Barrie
Biotica Technology Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
02 / MOSS, Steven
Biotica Technology Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
03 / ZHANG, Ming
Biotica Technology Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius Intellectual Property Consultants Ltd Taylor House 39 High Street
Marlow, Bucks. SL7 1AF / GB
Application number, filing date07729249.817.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP54801
Priority number, dateGB2006000998119.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0609981
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007135078
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023915
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/335, A61P35/04
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BORRELIDIN-DERIVATE ALS ANTIPROLIFERATIVE WIRKSTOFFE UND ANGIOGENESE-HEMMER[2009/08]
English:BORRELIDIN DERIVATIVES AS ANTIPROLIFERATIVE AGENTS AND ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS[2009/08]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE BORRELIDINE UTILISÉES EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTIPROLIFÉRATIFS, INHIBITEURS DE L' ANGIOGENÉSE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2008National basic fee paid 
27.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
08.04.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO0109113  (GYOGYSZERKUTATO INTEZET [HU], et al) [DY] 1-32 * example - *;
 [DX]WO2004058976  (BIOTICA TECH LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-32 * page 29 - page 30; examples 1,2 *
 [DY]  - WAKABAYASHI ET AL, "Borrelidin is an angiogenesis inhibitor;disruption of angiogenic capillary vessels in a rat aorta matrix culture model", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (199708), vol. 50, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 671 - 676, XP002158986 [DY] 1-32 * figure 1 *